Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103146

EP1103146 - FAULT CONTROL AND RESTORATION IN A DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HILTUNEN, Seppo
Karhunhammas 2 I 9
FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene , et al
Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene , et al
Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99939450.503.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999EP05658
Priority number, dateFI1998000170506.08.1998         Original published format: FI 981705
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008873
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103146
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103146
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/545, G06F11/14
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FEHLERKONTROLLE UND -KORREKTUR IN EINEM DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2001/22]
English:FAULT CONTROL AND RESTORATION IN A DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2001/22]
French:CORRECTION DE DEFAUTS ET RETABLISSEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2001National basic fee paid 
17.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
IT11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY03.08.2003
LU03.08.2003
IE05.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2005/02]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY03.08.2003
LU03.08.2003
IE05.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/40]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY03.08.2003
LU03.08.2003
IE05.08.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY03.08.2003
LU03.08.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/36]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY03.08.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/34]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
FR11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/29]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/28]AT11.06.2003
BE11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT11.06.2003
CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/02]CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH05282224  ;
 [A]US5636341  (MATSUSHITA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 35 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3212237  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 4 *;
 [A]JPH0590901
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940204), vol. 018, no. 070, Database accession no. (P - 1687), [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930811), vol. 017, no. 434, Database accession no. (E - 1412), [A] 1-6 * abstract *