Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO0010304

WO0010304 - NETWORK ACCESS CONTROL DEVICE THROUGH FAST RECOGNITION OF APPLICATION FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alasi di Arcieri Franco & C. S.A.S.
Via Mario Chiri 25
00171 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCIERI, Franco
Via Mario Chiri, 25
I-00171 Roma / IT
02 / MARINELLI, Guido, Maria
Via Squillace, 108
I-00178 Roma / IT
03 / TALAMO, Maurizio
Via Emanuele Filiberto, 233
I-00185 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Application number, filing date99939606.211.08.1999
WO1999IT00262
Priority number, dateIT1998RM0054212.08.1998         Original published format: IT RM980542
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0010304
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE 
TitleGerman:NETZWERKZUGRIFFSSTEUERUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR SCHNELLES ERKENNEN VON ANWENDUNGSRAHMEN ERFÜLLEN EINES SATZES VON VORGEGEBENEN REGELN
English:NETWORK ACCESS CONTROL DEVICE THROUGH FAST RECOGNITION OF APPLICATION FRAMES
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'ACCES AU RESEAU PAR RECONNAISSANCE RAPIDE DE TRAMES D'APPLICATION
Examination procedure09.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/02]
30.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2002/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.04.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5793954  (BAKER PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 43 * * column 4, lines 1-42 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 40 * * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0595509  (LANNET DATA COMMUNICATIONS LTD [IL]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 40 * * column 5, lines 1-19 *
 [A]  - PRUFER R J, "NETWORK ADVISOR PROTOCOL ANALYSIS: DECODES", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL,US,HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. PALO ALTO, vol. 43, no. 5, page 34-40, XP000349772 [A] 1-13 * page 37, column L, line 1 - page 38, column R, line 16 *
 [A]  - SUNIL BHAT, "THE NETWORK ADVISOR ANALYSIS AND REAL-TIME ENVIRONMENT", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL,US,HEWLETT-PACKARD CO. PALO ALTO, vol. 43, no. 5, page 29-33, XP000349771 [A] 1-13 * page 29, column R, line 34 - page 30, column R, line 14 * * page 31, column L, line 40 - column R, line 38 *