Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1104574

EP1104574 - APPARATUS FOR CONTROL AND CERTIFICATION OF THE DELIVERY OF GOODS OBJECT OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE AND FOR THE CONCURRENT CONTROL AND CERTIFICATION OF THE EXECUTION OF THE RELATED PAYMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alasi di Arcieri Franco & C. S.A.S.
Via Mario Chiri 25
00171 Roma / IT
[2001/23]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCIERI, Franco
Via Mario Chiri, 25
I-00171 Roma / IT
02 / MARINELLI, Guido, Maria
Via Squillace, 108
I-00178 Roma / IT
03 / TALAMO, Maurizio
Via Emanuele Filiberto, 233
I-00185 Roma / IT
 [2001/23]
Representative(s)Leone, Mario , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/23]Leone, Mario , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date99939607.011.08.1999
[2001/23]
WO1999IT00263
Priority number, dateIT1998RM0054112.08.1998         Original published format: IT RM980541
[2001/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0010142
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1104574
Date:06.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2001/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1104574
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1104574
Date:23.11.2005
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F19/00
[2001/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND ZERTIFIZIERUNG VON WARENLIEFERUNGEN DES ELEKTRONISCHEN HANDELS UND ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN STEUERUNG UND ZERTIFIZIERUNG DER DAMIT VERBUNDENEN ZAHLUNGSAUSFÜHRUNG[2001/23]
English:APPARATUS FOR CONTROL AND CERTIFICATION OF THE DELIVERY OF GOODS OBJECT OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE AND FOR THE CONCURRENT CONTROL AND CERTIFICATION OF THE EXECUTION OF THE RELATED PAYMENT[2001/23]
French:APPAREIL POUR GERER ET CERTIFIER LA DISTRIBUTION DE BIENS ECHANGES ELECTRONIQUEMENT, ET POUR GERER ET CERTIFIER SIMULTANEMENT L'EXECUTION DES PAIEMENTS Y RELATIFS[2001/23]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2001National basic fee paid 
12.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
15.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2004Fee for grant paid
14.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2005Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
22.03.2005Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
CY11.08.2005
LU11.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/23]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
CY11.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
LU06.09.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/28]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
MC31.08.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
DK06.10.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/22]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
NL06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.07.2005
CH06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
LI06.07.2005
GR06.10.2005
SE06.10.2005
ES17.10.2005
PT12.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.07.2005
FI06.07.2005
SE06.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9849658  (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [PA] 1,2 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - line 20 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [PA]WO9836532  (ALGOTECH SISTEMI S R L [IT], et al) [PA] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0801479  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - line 40 * * claims 12-14 *;
 [A]US5727163  (BEZOS JEFFREY P [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5602905  (METTKE RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 66 - line 67 * * claims 1,4 *