Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099225

EP1099225 - DISPOSABLE CONTAINER FOR IRRADIATION PELLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2003New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emory University
1380 South Oxford Road, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30322 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
EMORY UNIVERSITY
1380 South Oxford Road, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30322 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TING, Joseph, Y.
6324 Spring Lake Drive
Flowery Branch, GA 30542 / US
02 / ELDER, Eric, S.
2580 Whiteleigh Drive, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30345 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Boff, James Charles , et al
Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Boff, James Charles , et al
Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date99939647.602.07.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US15034
Priority number, dateUS19980093354P20.07.1998         Original published format: US 93354 P
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005726
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099225
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G21F5/02, A61M31/00
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:EINWEGBEHÄLTER TUM EINSCHLUSS VON BESTRAHLUNGSTABLETTEN[2001/20]
English:DISPOSABLE CONTAINER FOR IRRADIATION PELLETS[2001/20]
French:CONTENANT JETABLE POUR PASTILLES D'IRRADIATION[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2001National basic fee paid 
19.02.2001Search fee paid 
22.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.02.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
31.05.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5147295  (STEWART R GLEN [US]);
 [X]US5147282  (KAN WILLIAM [US]);
 [A]US5090408  (SPOFFORD BRYAN T [US], et al)