EP1102763 - FSH MIMETICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V. Pietermaai 15 Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL TAYER, Nabil 143 Gerald Road Milton, MA 02186 / US | 02 /
REDDY, Adulla 2702 Village Road West Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 03 /
BUCKLER, David 11 Conifer Drive Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | 04 /
MAGAR, Sharad 20 Harrison Road Caton, MA 02021 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99939686.4 | 05.08.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999US17755 | Priority number, date | US19980095712P | 07.08.1998 Original published format: US 95712 P | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0008015 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102763 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102763 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/445, A61K31/40, C07D405/14, C07D405/12, C07K5/06, C07D471/04, A61P5/24 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FSH MIMETIKA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFERTILITÄT | [2001/22] | English: | FSH MIMETICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY | [2001/22] | French: | ANALOGUES DE L'HORMONE DE STIMULATION DES FOLLICULES POUR TRAITER L'INFERTILITE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03023514.7 / EP1380582 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5071836 (KOLAR CENEK [DE], et al) [A] 1,19* column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 25 * | Examination | JPS5331669 | DE3636278 | - KISSEI PHARMACEUT CO LTD, "N-ACYLPIPERIDINECAROXYANILIDE DERIVATIVES", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1989), Database accession no. 89:129406 | - Lasch et al., FEBS Lett. (1988), 227(2), 171-4 | - Endröczi et al., Acta Physiol. Hung. (1994), 82(2), 131-138 | - Yoshimoto et al., J. Biochem. (1985), 98(4), 975-9 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780616), vol. 002, no. 076, Database accession no. (C - 015), & JP53031669 A 19780325 (KISSEI PHARMACEUT CO LTD) |