Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037862

EP1037862 - FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KRIJN, Marcellinus, P., C., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / DONA, Marinus, J., J.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / SWINKELS, Johannes, M., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / VLEGGAAR, Jeroen, J., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99939992.607.07.1999
[2000/39]
WO1999EP04759
Priority number, dateEP1998020242120.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98202421
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005180
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037862
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037862
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/32, G02F1/133
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/39]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLES SUBSTRAT[2000/39]
English:FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE[2000/39]
French:SUBSTRAT FLEXIBLE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2000National basic fee paid 
03.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
21.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2005Fee for grant paid
09.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL13.07.2005
[2006/14]
Cited inInternational search[E]DE19810325  (PLATZ KARL OTTO [DE]) [E] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH10167761  ;
 [A]JPS5593127  ;
 [A]JPH08304831
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801007), vol. 004, no. 142, Database accession no. (P - 030), [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [A] 1-8 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0945254