Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103135

EP1103135 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A SERVICE FOR A SUBSCRIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.11.2005  [2005/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZYGAN-MAUS, Renate
Glötzleweg 35
D-81477 München / DE
 [2001/22]
Application number, filing date99940145.804.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999EP05651
Priority number, dateEP1998011475105.08.1998         Original published format: EP 98114751
[2001/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008835
Date:17.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103135
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103135
Date:08.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04Q7/22, H04M15/00
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ADMINISTRIEREN EINES DIENSTES FÜR EINEN TEILNEHMER[2001/22]
English:METHOD FOR MANAGING A SERVICE FOR A SUBSCRIBER[2001/22]
French:ADMINISTRATION D'UN SERVICE POUR UN UTILISATEUR[2004/18]
Former [2001/22]ADMINISTRATION DE SERVICES DESTIN S UN UTILISATEUR
Entry into regional phase05.01.2001National basic fee paid 
05.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
05.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2004Fee for grant paid
04.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9809425  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-9 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 23 * * page 18, line 15 - page 19, line 11 *;
 [XA]EP0844799  (PACIFIC BELL [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 6 * * column 10, line 22 - line 33 * [A] 3,5,7,9;
 [A]EP0602779  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 33 - line 49 * * column 5, line 43 - line 52 *;
 [A]EP0738093  (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 17 * * column 5, line 21 - line 34 *;
 [A]EP0734143  (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 25 *