Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035669

EP1035669 - OPTICAL SIGNAL QUALITY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/37]OPTICAL SIGNAL QUALITY MONITOR
[2007/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For all designated states
KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2 chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
[2008/43]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For all designated states
KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2 chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For all designated states
KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2 chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIZUOCHI, Takashi Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / OSAKI, Yojiro Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / UEMURA, Aritomo Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / ICHIBANGASE, Hiroshi Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / MATSUSHITA, Kiwami Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
06 / KITAYAMA, Tadayoshi Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
07 / YAMAMOTO, Shu KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
08 / MIYAZAKI, Tetsuya KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
09 / KABASHIMA, Takatomi KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
10 / KOBAYASHI, Naoki KDD Corporation
3-2, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-8003 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99940529.327.08.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999JP04644
Priority number, dateJP1998024559431.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24559498
[2000/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0013345
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035669
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035669
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/08, H04L1/20, H04J3/14
[2004/42]
Former International [2004/25]H04B10/08, H04L1/20
Former International [2000/37]H04B10/08, H04B17/00, H04J3/00, H04L25/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE SIGNALQUALITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG[2000/37]
English:OPTICAL SIGNAL QUALITY MONITORING[2007/48]
French:SURVEILLANCE DE LA QUALITÉ D'UN SIGNAL OPTIQUE[2007/48]
Former [2000/37]OPTICAL SIGNAL QUALITY MONITOR
Former [2000/37]SURVEILLANCE DE LA QUALITE D'UN SIGNAL OPTIQUE
Entry into regional phase27.04.2000Translation filed 
27.04.2000National basic fee paid 
27.04.2000Search fee paid 
27.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
29.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2008Fee for grant paid
01.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05090304.6  / EP1635484
EP05090305.3  / EP1641149
EP05090306.1  / EP1641150
Opposition(s)23.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2315938  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 26 - line 28 * * page 3, line 9 - line 16 * * page 3, line 31 - line 34 * * page 5, line 3 - line 6 * * page 5, line 21 - line 23 * * page 6, line 1 - line 3 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 12 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 13 * * page 9, line 24 - line 31 * * page 10, line 34 - line 36 * * page 4, line 27 - line 28 * * figures 2,4 * [Y] 5-8;
 [X]WO9724823  (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 3 - line 27; figure 6A *;
 [PX]GB2332317  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [PX] 1 * page 9, line 24 - line 27 * * page 16, line 18 - page 17, line 10 * * page 19, line 25 - page 20, line 5 * * figure 10 *;
 [YA]EP0777345  (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 11, line 43 - line 56; figure 3 * * abstract * * figure 3 * [A] 6-8;
 [Y]FR2740282  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8 * page 15, line 3 - line 9 * * page 17, line 6 - page 18, line 2 * * figures 3,5,8 *;
 [A]US5729373  (SAKUYAMA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 4 * abstract *;
 [PA]  KUWAHARA S ET AL, "Adaptive dispersion equalisation by detecting dispersion fluctuations using PM-AM conversion", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19981001), vol. 34, no. 20, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1956 - 1958, XP006010393 [PA] 9 * page 1956, column L, line 10 - line 13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19981353
International search[A]JPH04298131  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al);
 [A]JPH0396135  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0787018  (NEC CORP, et al)