Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035211

EP1035211 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARACHIDONIC ACID-CONTAINING LIPID AND DIHOMO-gamma-LINOLENIC ACID-CONTAINING LIPID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Suntory Holdings Limited
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8203 / JP
[2009/30]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKIMOTO, Kengo
1-9-5-1006, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP
02 / HIGASHIYAMA, Kenichi
1-9-5-602, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho
Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP
03 / SHIMIZU, Sakayu
6-9, Tokiwayamashita-cho, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616-8212 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2000/37]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99940538.427.08.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999JP04653
Priority number, dateJP1998024358328.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24358398
[2000/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0012744
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035211
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035211
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/64, C12R1/645
[2005/01]
Former International [2000/37]C12P7/64, // C12P7:64, C12R1:645
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ARACHIDONSÄURE ENTHALTENDEM LIPID UND VON DI-HOMO-GAMMA-LINOLSÄURE ENTHALTENDEM LIPID.[2000/37]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARACHIDONIC ACID-CONTAINING LIPID AND DIHOMO-gamma-LINOLENIC ACID-CONTAINING LIPID[2000/37]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LIPIDE CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ARACHIDONIQUE ET DE LIPIDE CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE DIHOMO-gamma-LINOLENIQUE[2000/37]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase10.05.2000Translation filed 
17.05.2000National basic fee paid 
17.05.2000Search fee paid 
17.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
27.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2012Fee for grant paid
22.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2007
Opposition(s)14.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.09.2008Request for further processing filed
23.09.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
20.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
22.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE27.08.2012
LU27.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2013/33]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
IE27.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
ES22.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/16]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
DK11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT11.04.2012
BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE11.04.2012
CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
PT13.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
GR12.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY11.04.2012
FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI11.04.2012
SE11.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]  SHIMIZU S ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF USEFUL FATTY ACIDS BY MICROBIAL PROCESSES", RECENT RES. DEVEL. IN LIPIDS RES, XX, XX, (1997), vol. 1, pages 267 - 286, XP001026965 [X] 1-22 * see pages 267-276 *
 [X]  SPYCHALLA J ET AL, "Identification of an animal omega-3 fatty acid desaturase by heterologous expression in Arabidopsis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970218), vol. 4, no. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1142 - 1147, XP002076628 [X] 5-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1142
International search[X]JPH02142486  (LION CORP);
 [X]WO9621037  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al);
 [XP]WO9839468  (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH08214893  (OMEGATECH INC [US])
 [X]  - LI ZU-YI ET AL., "Process for production of arachidonic acid concentrate by a strain of Mortierella alpina", CAN. J. CHEM. ENG., (1995), vol. 73, no. 1, pages 135 - 139, XP002924346
 [X]  - TOTANI N, SOMEYA K, OBA K, "INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTION OF ARACHIDONIC ACID BY MORTIERELLA", INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS OF SINGLE CELL OILS., XX, XX, XX, (19920101), pages 52 - 60, XP002924347
 [XP]  - SHIMADA Y. ET AL., "Enzymatic enrichment of arachidonic acid from Mortierrella single-cell oil", J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC., (199809), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 1213 - 1217, XP002924348
 [Y]  - SHIMADA Y. ET AL., "Enrichment of arachidonic acid: Selective hydrolysis of a single-cell oil from Mortierrella with Candida cylindracea lipase", J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 72, no. 11, pages 1323 - 1327, XP002924349

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02546206
 [A]  - LINDBERG A.M. ET AL., "Effect of temperature and glucose supply on the production of polyunsaturated fatty acids by the fungus Mortierella alpina CBS 343.66 in fermenter cultures", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 39, no. 4-5, pages 450 - 455, XP002924350

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00205031
Examination   BAJPAI P.K. ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF ARACHIDONIC ACID BY MORTIERELLA-ALPINA ATCC 32222", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0169-4146, pages 179 - 186,
    SINGH A. ET AL, "Production of high yields of arachidonic acid in a fed-batch system by Mortierella alpina ATCC 32222", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 1 - 5,
    TOTANI N. ET AL, "THE FILAMENTOUS FUNGUS MORTIERELLA-ALPINA, HIGH IN ARACHIDONIC ACID", LIPIDS, SPRINGER, US, vol. 22, no. 12, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF02536452, ISSN 0024-4201, (19871201), pages 1060 - 1062, (20061130), XP008105254

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02536452
    JAREONKITMONGKOL SAEREE ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of an omega-3-desaturation-defective mutant of an arachidonic acid-producing fungus, Mortierella alpina 1S-4", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DE, (19940101), vol. 161, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1007/BF00303586, ISSN 0302-8933, pages 316 - 319, XP009107080

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00303586