Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1129158

EP1129158 - MIXED ESTERS OF PENTAERYTHRITOL FOR REFRIGERATION BASE OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 07.09.2011  [2011/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMOMURA, Yuji, Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corp.
Lubricants & Specialties Dept.
Lubricant Res. Lab
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP
02 / HIRANO, Hiroyuki
1-10-11-202, Higashi-tabata
Kita-ku, Tokyo 114-0013 / JP
 [2011/36]
Former [2001/36]01 / SHIMOMURA, Yuji, Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corp.
Lubricants & Specialties Dept., Lubricant Res. Lab
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP
02 / HIRANO, Hiroyuki
1-10-11-202, Higashi-tabata
Kita-ku, Tokyo 114-0013 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/36]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2001/36]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99940626.702.09.1999
[2001/36]
WO1999JP04763
Priority number, dateJP1998024821002.09.1998         Original published format: JP 24821098
[2001/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0014189
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1129158
Date:05.09.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2001/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1129158
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1129158
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10M105/38, C10M171/00, C09K5/04
[2011/36]
Former International [2001/36]C10M105/38, C10M171/00, C09K5/04, // C10N40:30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/36]
Extension statesAL30.03.2001
LT30.03.2001
LV30.03.2001
MK30.03.2001
RO30.03.2001
SI30.03.2001
TitleGerman:MISCHESTER VON PENTAERYTHRITOL FÜR KÄLTEMASCHINENÖLE[2001/36]
English:MIXED ESTERS OF PENTAERYTHRITOL FOR REFRIGERATION BASE OILS[2001/36]
French:ESTERS MIXTES DE PENTAERYTHRITOL POUR HUILES DE BASE DE REFRIGERANTS[2001/36]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2001National basic fee paid 
30.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
26.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2002Fee for grant paid
30.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
20 Manchester Square
London W1U 3AN / GB
Opponent's representative
Humphries, Martyn, et al
Croda Europe Limited Intellectual Property Cowick Hall Snaith Goole
East Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB
 02  30.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Lubrizol Limited
Dock Road South
Merseyside L52 4SH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2011/03]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
20 Manchester Square
London W1U 3AN / GB
Opponent's representative
Humphries, Martyn, et al
Croda Europe Limited Intellectual Property Cowick Hall Snaith Goole
East Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB
 02  30.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Lubrizol Limited
Dock Road South Bromborough, Wirral
Merseyside L52 4SH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2004/12]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries plc
20 Manchester Square
London W1U 3AN / GB
Opponent's representative
Ralph, Julie Diane, et al
Uniqema Limited Uniqema Intellectual Property Dept. Wilton Centre
Redcar TS10 4RF / GB
 02  30.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Lubrizol Limited
Dock Road South Bromborough, Wirral
Merseyside L52 4SH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2003/40]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries plc
20 Manchester Square
London W1U 3AN / GB
Opponent's representative
Ralph, Julie Diane, et al
Uniqema Limited Uniqema Intellectual Property Dept. Wilton Centre
Redcar TS10 4RF / GB
 02  30.04.2003  13.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Lubrizol Adibis Holdings (UK) Limited
Dock Road South
Bromborough, Wirral Merseyside L62 4SH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2003/26]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.2003   
ICI Lacke Farben GmbH
Düsseldorfer Str. 102
D-4010 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Ralph, Julie Diane, et al
Uniqema Limited Uniqema Intellectual Property Dept. Wilton Centre
Redcar TS10 4RF / GB
 02  30.04.2003   
Lubrizol Adibis Holdings (UK) Limited
Dock Road South
Bromborough, Wirral Merseyside L62 4SH / GB
Opponent's representative
Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
05.06.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.07.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
05.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2008Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
11.02.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.10.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.11.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.07.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.09.2005Appeal received No.  T1209/05
11.11.2005Statement of grounds filed
17.12.2007Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
17.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
27.12.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
IT31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
LU02.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
MC01.04.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2006/44]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
LU02.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
MC01.04.2003
Former [2004/39]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
LU02.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/10]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/05]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2003/48]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
Former [2003/46]AT31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
Former [2003/42]AT31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
IE02.09.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
Former [2003/31]AT31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
Former [2003/22]FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT18.11.2002
Former [2003/20]FI31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
Former [2003/14]FI31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE31.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0468729  (CASTROL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, column 2, line 36 - page 2, column 2, line 39 * * page 2, column 2, line 44 - page 2, column 2, line 51 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0653479  (TONEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 19 * * page 4, line 51 - page 4, line 55 * * page 16, line 1 - page 16, line 8 *;
 [A]US5021179  (ZEHLER EUGENE R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * table 2 *;
 [A]US5681800  (DUNCAN CAROLYN BOGGUS [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 45 *
OppositionWO9012849
 EP0449406
 EP0406479
 EP0501440
 EP0336171
 EP0715079
    - M. MURAKI ET AL., "Refrigeration lubricant based on polyolester for use with HFCs and prospect of its application with R-22 (Part 1) tribological characteristics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 INTERNATIONAL REFRIGERATION CONFERENCE AT PURDUE, (19960723), pages 273 - 278