Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1129158 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1129158



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1467
29.07.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
11.08.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.08.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.08.2011 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.07.2011 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.07.2011 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
19.04.2011 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
11.04.2011 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
21.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.11.2010 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.10.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.10.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.10.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
28.10.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.01.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
03.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2009 Request for correction Opposition 2
05.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.10.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
27.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Description Opposition 3
19.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
05.11.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
05.11.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.04.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
27.12.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
03.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.12.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
22.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
02.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.09.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.09.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.09.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
19.09.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
19.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
06.12.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
06.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
31.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
31.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.05.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
04.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
30.03.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
11.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
11.11.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
11.11.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 4
11.11.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 4
10.11.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.09.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.09.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.09.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
04.07.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 22
04.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.06.2005 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
20.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
15.06.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.06.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
14.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
30.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
23.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
20.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
20.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.05.2005 Claims Opposition 2
19.05.2005 Claims Opposition 2
19.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
19.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
02.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.04.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.12.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
27.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 9
23.11.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 3
18.11.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.11.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
29.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.08.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
11.08.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.08.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
05.06.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.06.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.04.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
30.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
30.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
30.04.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
29.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
20.06.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.02.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
29.01.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.09.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.09.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.09.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
25.07.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.07.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.06.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.06.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 24
30.03.2001 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.05.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.04.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.04.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.04.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.04.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.04.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.03.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.03.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.03.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.03.2000 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.03.2000 Priority document Search / examination 22
16.03.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
16.03.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 25
16.09.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.09.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 2
16.09.1999 Description International Searching Authority 21