Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1107659

EP1107659 - WIND MACHINE FOR HARVESTING AND GATHERING OLIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teixeira Da Costa, Miguel Pelagio
Avenida Gonçalo Velho Cabral Lote 8-1 C.
2750 Cascais / PT
[2001/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)Barros, Joao Carlos
Praça Duque da Terceira, 24 - 3o
1200-161 Lisboa / PT
[2001/25]
Application number, filing date99940760.410.08.1999
[2001/25]
WO1999PT00014
Priority number, datePT1998010219017.08.1998         Original published format: PT 10219098
[2001/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008914
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1107659
Date:20.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2001/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1107659
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01D46/00
[2001/25]
Designated contracting statesCY,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT [2003/23]
Former [2001/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:WINDMASCHINE ZUM ERNTEN UND SAMMELN VON OLIVEN[2001/25]
English:WIND MACHINE FOR HARVESTING AND GATHERING OLIVES[2001/25]
French:MACHINE PNEUMATIQUE POUR LA RECOLTE ET LE RAMASSAGE DES OLIVES[2001/25]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2001National basic fee paid 
14.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
25.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2002Fee for grant paid
08.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2228421  (HIPOLITO ALBERTO [PT]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4212148  (BROWNLEE J O [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3979891  (PATTON ORVIL D) [A] 1,4 * column 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]FR704012  (COEYTAUX);
 [A]US3165879  (CHAPIN JACK R)
by applicantPT91416
 PT96472
 PT94709
 US5437146
 DE3006177