Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102666

EP1102666 - POINT COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGA AKTIEBOLAG
181 81 Lidingö / SE
[2001/22]
Inventor(s)01 / ORS N, Mikael
Knipvägen 32
S-184 62 kersberga / SE
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Kasseckert, Rainer , et al
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Patent und Marken
Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Kasseckert, Rainer , et al
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2003/03]Kasseckert, Rainer , et al
Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2001/22]Estreen, Lars , et al
Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99941943.505.08.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999SE01336
Priority number, dateSE1998000268306.08.1998         Original published format: SE 9802683
[2001/22]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0007790
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102666
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C35/16, F25D3/10, // (A61F7/00, C21D1:613)
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/22]
TitleGerman:PUNKTKÜHLUNG[2001/22]
English:POINT COOLING[2001/22]
French:REFROIDISSEMENT PONCTUEL[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999Translation filed 
11.01.2001National basic fee paid 
11.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
05.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/34]
21.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3322312  (LINDE AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0872563  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]);
 [A]US5154062  (GAUMER JR LEE S [US], et al);
 [A]SE506728  (AGA AB [SE])