EP1025606 - BATTERY CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION 13135 West Lisbon Road Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRISP, Robert W267 S8635 Rustic View Lane Mukwonago, WI 53149 / US | 02 /
GLASGOW, Kevin N1047 Mink LN Campbellsport, WI 53010-2431 / US | 03 /
WILLHIDE, Joseph 15985 Pomona Road Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99942166.2 | 13.08.1999 | [2000/32] | WO1999US18437 | Priority number, date | US19980374558 | 13.08.1998 Original published format: US 374558 | US19980096524P | 14.08.1998 Original published format: US 96524 P | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010218 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025606 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/46 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
H02J7/0031 (EP,US);
H02J7/00038 (EP,US);
H02J7/00041 (EP,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
H02J7/00302 (EP,US);
H02J2207/40 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | BATTERIELADEGERÄT | [2000/32] | English: | BATTERY CHARGER | [2000/32] | French: | CHARGEUR DE BATTERIE | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 11.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/03] | 12.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4665354 (SADA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5644211 (TOKUYAMA YOSHITAKA [JP]) |