EP1064285 - NOVEL CEPHALOTAXANE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRAGEN PHARMA SA Rue Hugo de Senger 3 1205 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states STRAGEN PHARMA SA Rue Hugo-de-Senger 3 1205 Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Oncopharm Corporation 7707 Fannin Houston, TX 77054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBIN, Jean-Pierre 28, rue Sainte Croix F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 02 /
ROBIN, Julie 17, rue de l'Alma F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 03 /
CAVOLEAU, Sylvie 52, rue Chèvre F-49000 Angers / FR | 04 /
CHAUVIAT, Ludovic 4, rue Bossuet F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 05 /
CHARBONNEL, Sandra 23, avenue Vauban F-49000 Angers / FR | 06 /
DHAL, Robert 12, rue des Bois, Le Champ du Dragon 72700 Pruille le Chétif / FR | 07 /
DUJARDIN, Gilles 5, rue de l'Ormeau F-72700 Rouillon / FR | 08 /
FOURNIER, Florence Appartement A 504, 4, rue Paul Courboulay 72000 Le Mans / FR | 09 /
GILET, Chrystelle 97, avenue Bollée F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 10 /
GIRODIER, Laurent 215, avenue Rubillard F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 11 /
MEVELEC, Laurence 17, rue des Remparts F-27400 Louviers / FR | 12 /
POUTOT, Sandrine 126, rue de Funay F-72000 Le Mans / FR | 13 /
ROUAUD, Sylvie 213, avenue Rubillard F-72000 Le Mans / FR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Ahner, Francis, et al CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99942587.9 | 17.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999IB00491 | Priority number, date | FR19980003492 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803492 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948894 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064285 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064285 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/20, A61K31/55, C07D453/04, C07D309/08, C07D303/48, C07D305/08, C07C57/13, C07D493/10, // (C07D491/20, 317:00, 223:00), C07D209:00,(C07D493/10, 331:00), C07D307:00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C07D493/10 (EP,US);
C07D491/147 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C57/13 (EP,KR,US);
C07C59/42 (EP,US);
C07C59/48 (EP,US);
C07C69/732 (EP,KR,US);
C07D203/08 (KR);
C07D263/16 (KR);
C07D303/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D305/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/16 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | CEPHALOTOXANDERIVATIVE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/01] | English: | NOVEL CEPHALOTAXANE DERIVATIVES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [2001/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE CEPHALOTAXANE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 02.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - S. HIRANUMA ET AL., "Studies in cephalotaxus alkaloids. Stereospecific total synthesis of homoharringtonine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (1983), vol. 48, no. 26, pages 5321 - 26, XP002087582 [A] 1 * Schéma III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00174a031 | [X] - H. A. BATES, "Decarbonylation of tetrahydrofuran-2-carboxylic acids and tetrahydropyran-2-carboxylic acids in concentrated sulfuric acid: formation of oxonium ions", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (1982), vol. 104, no. 9, pages 2490 - 2493, XP002087583 [X] 59 * composés 1,3,5,7,9,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00373a025 | [X] - P. G. M. WUTS ET AL., "An electrochemical synthesis from 2-carboxy-2-allyl-tetrahydropyrans", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (1982), vol. 23, no. 39, pages 3987 - 3990, XP002087584 [X] 59,61 * composés de formule 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)88676-1 | [X] - M. NAGAI ET AL., "The stereochemistry of protopanaxadiol. The absolute configuration of C(20) of dammarenediol-I and -II", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (1966), no. 40, pages 4797 - 4801, XP002087585 [X] 59 * formules XIII and XVI * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)70093-1 | [X] - Y. LEROUX, "Obtention de nitriles tétrahydrfuranniques et tétrahydropyranniques par action du CuCN sur les c'etones gamma et delta halogénées", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE., PARIS FR, (1968), no. 1, pages 344 - 351, XP002087586 [X] 59 * tables II,IV * |