EP0986058 - NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUOKA, Yasuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 02 /
CHIBA, Norio Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 03 /
KASAMA, Nobuyuki Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 04 /
NIWA, Takashi Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 05 /
NAKAJIMA, Kunio Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99942601.8 | 12.03.1999 | [2000/11] | WO1999JP01213 | Priority number, date | JP19980075417 | 24.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7541798 | [2000/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949462 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986058 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986058 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G11B7/12 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/122 (EP,US);
G11B7/124 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | G11B7/135 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/11] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER NAHFELDKOPF | [2000/11] | English: | NEAR-FIELD OPTICAL HEAD | [2000/11] | French: | TETE OPTIQUE A CHAMP PROCHE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | Translation filed | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 15.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5199090 (BELL BERNARD W [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5497359 (MAMIN HARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,11,12; | [Y]EP0814468 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 7,8,11,12* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH01307934 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [Y]JPH0291831 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH0882633 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH0922538 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH09231608 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |