Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1068443

EP1068443 - PRESSURE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2001/03]
Inventor(s)01 / OGATA, Kiyotaka
3-13-26, Yakyu-cho, Higoshimatsuyama-shi
Saitama 355 / JP
 [2001/03]
Application number, filing date99942718.030.06.1999
[2001/03]
WO1999DE01897
Priority number, dateDE199812955302.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829553
[2001/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0001936
Date:13.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1068443
Date:17.01.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1068443
Date:23.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02M59/46, F16K15/04
[2001/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/03]
TitleGerman:DRUCKVENTIL[2001/03]
English:PRESSURE VALVE[2001/03]
French:SOUPAPE DE PRESSION[2001/03]
Entry into regional phase03.04.2000National basic fee paid 
23.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
02.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2005Fee for grant paid
19.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.03.2005
[2008/18]
Cited inInternational search[X]US4651779  (FILIPPI RENATO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE19649541  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,10 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0142008  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * page 5, line 15 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 1 - line 19; figures 1,1A,3 *;
 [PX]JPH112167  ;
 [DPA]DE19710891  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DPA] * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 41; figure 1 *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, [PX] 1,2,4,6,10 * abstract *