Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1112575

EP1112575 - MAGNETORESISTIVE ELEMENT AND USE OF SAME AS STORAGE ELEMENT IN A STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/27]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWARZL, Siegfried
Josef-Kyrein-Strasse 11b
D-85579 Neubiberg / DE
 [2001/27]
Representative(s)Hermann, Uwe , et al
Epping Hermann Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Epping, Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date99942760.201.07.1999
[2001/27]
WO1999DE01942
Priority number, dateDE199814082307.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19840823
[2001/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0014748
Date:16.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1112575
Date:04.07.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1112575
Date:18.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/16, H01F10/08
[2001/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2002/51]
Former [2001/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:MAGNETORESISTIVES ELEMENT UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG ALS SPEICHERELEMENT IN EINER SPEICHERZELLENANORDNUNG[2001/27]
English:MAGNETORESISTIVE ELEMENT AND USE OF SAME AS STORAGE ELEMENT IN A STORAGE SYSTEM[2001/27]
French:ELEMENT MAGNETORESISTANT ET SON UTILISATION COMME ELEMENT DE MEMORISATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE CELLULES DE MEMOIRE[2001/27]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
04.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2002Fee for grant paid
01.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4945397  (SCHUETZ JAMES A [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 14; figures 3,4; claim 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]US5667879  (HAJI-SHEIKH MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 20 - column 4, line 46; figure 3 *