blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1107995

EP1107995 - BIFUNCTIONAL ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE IN TARGETING ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KS BIOMEDIX LTD.
42-46 High Street
Esher, Surrey KT10 9QY / GB
[2001/25]
Inventor(s)01 / HARRISON, Peter John, KS Biomedix Ltd.
42-46 High Street
Esher, Surrey KT10 9QY / GB
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)Chapman, Paul William
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Chapman, Paul William
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2001/25]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99943138.006.09.1999
[2001/25]
WO1999GB02938
Priority number, dateGB1998001941104.09.1998         Original published format: GB 9819411
[2001/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0014119
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1107995
Date:20.06.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/30, A61K39/395
[2001/25]
CPC:
C07K16/18 (EP); A61K51/00 (KR); A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (EP); C07K2317/31 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RO05.03.2001
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIFUNKTIONELLE ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DIESER IN ZIELGERICHTETEN ANTI-TUMOR-MITTELN[2001/25]
English:BIFUNCTIONAL ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE IN TARGETING ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS[2001/25]
French:ANTICORPS BIFONCTIONNELS ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE CIBLAGE D'AGENTS ANTITUMORAUX[2001/25]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2001National basic fee paid 
05.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
29.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2002
30.09.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH05184383  ;
 [X]US4474893  (READING CHRISTOPHER L [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11,17,19,20 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0369566  (HYBRITECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11-14,17-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 49 - line 50 *;
 [A]WO9109134  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 12* page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 7 *;
 [X]US5217713  (IWASA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,17-20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9838513  (KHAW BAN AN [US], et al) [A] 6 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 36 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 34, Database accession no. 1993-269042, XP002901224 & JPH05184383 A 19930727 (DAINABOT CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,10-14,17-20 * abstract *
 [X]  - HUI ZHU ET AL, "Tumor Pretargeting for Radioimmunodetection and Radioimmunotherapy", J NUCL MED, (199801), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 65 - 76, XP002901225 [X] 1,3-6,11-14,17-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BRUYNCK A ET AL, "Characterisation of a humanised bispecific monoclonal antibody for cancer therapy", DIALOG, URL: EMBASE, XP002900882 [X] 1,3-6,11-14,17-20 * abstract *
    [ ] - BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, UK, (1993), vol. 67 367, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 436 - 440, XP002901232
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.