EP1031111 - TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/35] | PANNEAU TACTILE | ||
[2011/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUNZE LIMITED 1, Zeze, Aono-cho Ayabe-shi Kyoto, 623-0011 / JP | [2011/28] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states GUNZE LIMITED 1, Zeze, Aono-cho Ayabe-shi, Kyoto, 623-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Hirotoshi Room 103, 176-4, Takano, Rittoucho Kurita-gun, Shiga 520-3045 / JP | 02 /
NODA, Kazuhiro Room 610, Rekkusu Garden Moriyama 2-bankan 134-1,Yoshimicho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0021 / JP | 03 /
FURUKAWA, Shuji 116, Kamikiryucho, Kamita Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2111 / JP | 04 /
TANIMURA, Kohtaro Room 105, Takanohaitsu, 7, Daimoncho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0052 / JP | [2011/28] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
SATO, Hirotoshi Room 103, 176-4, Takano, Rittoucho Kurita-gun, Shiga 520-3045 / JP | ||
02 /
NODA, Kazuhiro R. 610, Rek.Gar.Moriyama 2-bank., 134-1,Yoshimicho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
FURUKAWA, Shuji 116, Kamikiryucho, Kamita Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2111 / JP | |||
04 /
TANIMURA, Kohtaro Room 105, Takanohaitsu, 7, Daimoncho Moriyama-shi, Shiga 524-0052 / JP | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2000/35] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99943201.6 | 08.09.1999 | [2000/35] | WO1999JP04854 | Priority number, date | JP19980256463 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25646398 | JP19980258569 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25856998 | JP19980301442 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30144298 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016251 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031111 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031111 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045, B32B15/08 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/045 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (EP);
G06F2203/04103 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | G06K11/12, B32B15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSTAFEL | [2000/35] | English: | TOUCH PANEL | [2011/03] | French: | ECRAN TACTILE | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/35] | PANNEAU TACTILE | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07003174.5 / EP1785823 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | IT | 13.07.2011 | NL | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | IE | 08.09.2011 | LU | 08.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | GB | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 08.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
NL | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 13.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10171599 ; | [A]JPH09237159 ; | [A]JPH09115385 ; | [A]JPH0713678 ; | [A]US4585689 (OHTA TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 16 * * column 2, line 5 - line 52 * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 65; figure 3 * * column 7, line 51 - column 9, line 43 *; | [A]US5668576 (IKURA KENICHIROU [JP], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 51 ** column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 3; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10171599 A 19980626 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09237159 A 19970909 (GUNZE LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09115385 A 19970502 (GUNZE LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07013678 A 19950117 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 5 * abstract * |