Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100313

EP1100313 - AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING ANIMAL RELATED OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DeLaval Holding AB
P.O. Box 39
147 21 Tumba / SE
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Mats
Skarpbrunnavägen 207
S-145 64 Norsborg / SE
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]Herbjörnsen, Rut
Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/21]Hammar, Ernst , et al
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99943528.223.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999SE01302
Priority number, dateSE1998000261324.07.1998         Original published format: SE 9802613
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004764
Date:03.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100313
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100313
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/017
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2004/27]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SICH AUF TIERE BEZIEHENDE HANDLUNGEN[2001/21]
English:AN APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING ANIMAL RELATED OPERATIONS[2001/21]
French:APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES OPERATIONS LIEES A UN ANIMAL[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2001National basic fee paid 
29.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
23.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2004Fee for grant paid
23.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.06.2004
IT30.06.2004
GB30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2006/32]FR30.06.2004
GB30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2006/13]GB30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0774203  (MAASLAND NV [NL]);
 [Y]GB2226941  (NAT RES DEV [GB]);
 [A]EP0300115  (DUVELSDORF & SOHN GMBH & CO KG [DE])