blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1105753

EP1105753 - DISPERSIVE MULTILAYER-MIRRORS AND METHOD FOR DESIGNING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COHERENT, INC.
5100 Patrick Henry Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95056 / US
[2001/24]
Inventor(s)01 / AUSTIN, R., Russel
384 Eagle Trace Drive
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019-2290 / US
02 / EDMOND, R., Ian
2733 Meadow Vista Road
Meadow Vista, CA 95722 / US
 [2001/34]
Former [2001/24]01 / AUSTIN, R., Russel
215 Butterfield Drive
Novato, CA 94945 / US
02 / EDMOND, R., Ian
2733 Meadow Vista Road
Meadow Vista, CA 95722 / US
Representative(s)Jackson, David Spence
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Jackson, David Spence
REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road
London, WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99943738.717.08.1999
[2001/24]
WO1999US18763
Priority number, dateUS1998013597218.08.1998         Original published format: US 135972
[2001/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0011501
Date:02.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1105753
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1105753
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:G02B5/08, H01S3/098
[2001/24]
CPC:
G02B5/0883 (EP,US); G02B5/0858 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/19]
Former [2001/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:DISPERSIVE MEHRSCHICHTIGE SPIEGEL UND ENTWURFSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2001/24]
English:DISPERSIVE MULTILAYER-MIRRORS AND METHOD FOR DESIGNING SAME[2001/24]
French:MIROIRS MULTICOUCHES A DISPERSION ET LEUR PROCEDE DE CONCEPTION[2001/24]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2001National basic fee paid 
13.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
26.04.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2003Fee for grant paid
10.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH07.05.2003
FR07.05.2003
IT07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2006/14]CH07.05.2003
FR07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
Former [2004/02]CH07.05.2003
LI07.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5734503  (SZIPOCS ROBERT [HU], et al) [DA] 1,8,9,17,22 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 35; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4756602  (SOUTHWELL WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8,9 * column 5, line 29 - line 46; figures 4,6 *;
 [DA]US3528726  (AUSTIN ROBERT R) [DA] 1,6,8,9 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - KOPF D ET AL, "ALL-IN-ONE DISPERSION-COMPENSATING SATURABLE ABSORBER MIRROR FOR COMPACT FEMTOSECOND LASER SOURCES", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19960401), vol. 21, no. 7, ISSN 0146-9592, page 486-488, XP000559766 [A] 1,2,8,9,17,22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JACOBSON J M ET AL, "FEMTOSECOND PULSE GENERATION IN A TI:AL2O3 LASER BY USING SECOND- AND THIRD-ORDER INTRACAVITY DISPERSION", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19921115), vol. 17, no. 22, ISSN 0146-9592, page 1608-1610, XP000320066 [A] 1,2,5,7-9,11,17,19,22 * page 1609 *
 [A]  - STINGL A ET AL, "GENERATION OF 11-FS PULSES FROM A TI:SAPPHIRE LASER WITHOUT THE USEOF PRISMS", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19940201), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0146-9592, page 204-206, XP000424365 [A] 9,17 * page 204, column R, paragraph L *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.