blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1107757

EP1107757 - CARBAMATE AND UREA COMPOSITIONS AND NEUROTROPHIC USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GPI NIL Holdings, Inc.
222 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19899 / US
[2001/27]
Former [2001/25]For all designated states
GUILFORD PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
6611 Tributary Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21224 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Jia-He
27 Warren Manor Court
Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US
02 / STEINER, Joseph, P.
3179 Jupiter Island Court
Mount Airy Mayland 21771 / US
03 / HAMILTON, Gregory, S.
6501 Frederick Road
Catonsville, MD 21228 / US
 [2001/32]
Former [2001/25]01 / LI, Jia-He
27 Warren Manor Court
Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US
02 / STEINER, Joseph, P.
988 Sugar Maple Street
Hampstead, MD 21074 / US
03 / HAMILTON, Gregory, S.
6501 Frederick Road
Catonsville, MD 21228 / US
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2001/25]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date99943869.024.08.1999
[2001/25]
WO1999US19261
Priority number, dateUS1998013967225.08.1998         Original published format: US 139672
[2001/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0010553
Date:02.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1107757
Date:20.06.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/4439, A61K31/401, A61P25/00, A61P25/02, A61P25/16, A61P25/28
[2001/25]
CPC:
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/401 (EP,US); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP); A61P25/16 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/25]
Extension statesAL21.03.2001
LT21.03.2001
LV21.03.2001
MK21.03.2001
RO21.03.2001
SI21.03.2001
TitleGerman:CARBAMAT UND HARNSTOFF ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND NEUROTROPHISCHE VERWENDUNGEN[2001/25]
English:CARBAMATE AND UREA COMPOSITIONS AND NEUROTROPHIC USES[2001/25]
French:COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE CARBAMATE ET D'UREE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS NEUROTROPHIQUES[2001/25]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2001National basic fee paid 
21.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
09.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
26.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9526337  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 23-31,37-44 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9615101  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 23-31 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9820893  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-9,15-31,37-44 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9837882  (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [PX] 1-44 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - J.P. STEINER ET AL., "Neurotrophic immunophilin ligands stimulate structural and functional recovery in neurodegenerative animal models", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1997), vol. 94, no. 5, pages 2019 - 2024, XP000876505 [A] 1-41 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.5.2019
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.