EP1068231 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF NORMAL OVARY TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hinzmann, Bernd, Dr. Saupéweg 10 13127 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Rosenthal, André, Prof. Waldmüllerstrasse 6 14482 Potsdam / DE | For all designated states Specht, Thomas, Dr. Trainsjochstrasse 19 83088 Kiefersfelden / DE | For all designated states Pilarsky, Christian, Dr. Wallotstrasse 35 01309 Dresden / DE | For all designated states Dahl, Edgar, Dr. c/o Institut für Pathologie, Universitätsklinikum der RWTH Aachen, Pauwelstrasse 30 52074 Aachen / DE | [2004/22] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states metaGen Pharmaceuticals GmbH Oudenarder Strasse 16 13347 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Metagen Gesellschaft für Genomforschung mbH Ihnestrasse 63 14195 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPECHT, Thomas Grabenstrasse 14 D-12209 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HINZMANN, Bernd Parkstrasse 19 D-13127 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHMITT, Armin Laubacher Strasse 6/II D-14197 Berlin / DE | 04 /
PILARSKY, Christian Heinrich-Lange-Strasse 13c D-01474 Schönfeld-Wei ig / DE | 05 /
DAHL, Edgar Eleonore-Procheska-Strasse 6 D-14480 Potsdam / DE | 06 /
ROSENTHAL, André Koppenplatz 10 D-10115 Berlin / DE | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/18] |
Former [2001/28] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, Dr, et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut Patentanwälte Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | Seuss, Thomas Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944132.2 | 31.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999DE01070 | Priority number, date | DE1998116395 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816395 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9951727 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1068231 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/335, G01N33/574, C12N15/00 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
G01N33/57449 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | C07K14/335 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN AUS OVARNORMALGEWEBE | [2001/03] | English: | HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES OF NORMAL OVARY TISSUE | [2001/03] | French: | SEQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES HUMAINES EXTRAITES DES TISSUS SAINS D'OVAIRES | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - SHUGRUE, C.A. ET AL., "Rattus norvegicus vesicle associated protein (VAP1) mRNA", EMBL/GENBANK, (19971114), XP002128356 [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - SHUGRUE ET AL., "Antibodies to an epitope on synapsin I ...", EUR. J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 65, no. (2), pages 327 - 340 | [A] - HILLIER, L. ET AL., "Soares ovary tumor NbHOT Homo sapiens cDNA clone 755776 (EST)", EMBL/GENBANK, (19970703), XP002128357 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - MASSART, C. ET AL., "H. Sapiens mRNA (EST; from fetal brain)", EMBL/GENBANK, (19960816), XP002128358 [A] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - HENRIKSEN, R. ET AL., "Expression and prognostik significance of TGF-beta isotypes ...", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (1995), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 213 - 220, XP002128353 [Y] 1-40 * Zusammenfassung * | [Y] - HIRTE, H.W. ET AL., "Differntial display of mRNA ...", PROC. AM. ASS. CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 36, no. 0, page 184, XP002128354 [Y] 1-40 * Zusammenfassung * | [Y] - YU, Y.H. ET AL., "Differntial display of genes expressed in normal ovarian surface epithelium ...", PROC. AM ASS. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 37, no. 0, page 592, XP002074635 [Y] 1-40 * Zusammenfassung * | [Y] - MOK, S.C. ET AL., "Molecular cloning of differentially expressed genes in human epithelial ovarian cancer", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 52, pages 247 - 252, XP002128355 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/gyno.1994.1040 | [Y] - YU, W. ET AL., "Large-scale concatenation cDNA sequencing", GENOME RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 7, pages 353 - 358, XP002128368 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * |