Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033407

EP1033407 - CORYNEFORM BACTERIA FOR PRODUCING L-GLU [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]PROCESS FOR CONSTRUCTING AMINO ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AMINO ACID BY FERMENTATION METHOD WITH THE USE OF THE THUS CONSTRUCTED AMINO ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM
[2009/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2010
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8315 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8315 / JP
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ASAKURA, Yoko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Jun, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
03 / KANNO, Sohei, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
04 / SUGA, Mikiko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
05 / KIMURA, Eiichiro, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
06 / ITO, Hisao, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
07 / MATSUI, Kazuhiko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
08 / OHSUMI, Tsuyoshi, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1,Kyobashi1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8315 / JP
09 / NAKAMATSU, Tsuyoshi, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
10 / KURAHASHI, Osamu, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
 [2009/43]
Former [2000/36]01 / ASAKURA, Yoko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Jun, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
03 / KANNO, Sohei, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
04 / SUGA, Mikiko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
05 / KIMURA, Eiichiro, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
06 / ITO, Hisao, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
07 / MATSUI, Kazuhiko, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
08 / OHSUMI, Tsuyoshi, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
15-1,Kyobashi1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0031 / JP
09 / NAKAMATSU, Tsuyoshi, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-080 / JP
10 / KURAHASHI, Osamu, c/o Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
1-1,Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99944770.922.09.1999
[2000/36]
WO1999JP05175
Priority number, dateJP1998027178625.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27178698
JP1998027178725.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27178798
[2000/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0018935
Date:06.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033407
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033407
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.04.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:C12P13/14, C12N1/21
[2009/22]
Former International [2000/36]C12N15/67, C12N15/52, C12P13/04, C12P13/14, C12P19/38, C12N9/02, C12N9/10, C12N1/21
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:CORYNEFORME BAKTERIEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-GLU[2009/22]
English:CORYNEFORM BACTERIA FOR PRODUCING L-GLU[2009/22]
French:BACTÉRIES CORYNÉFORMES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE L-GLU[2009/22]
Former [2000/36]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMINOSAEURE HERSTELLENDEN BAKTERIEN UND DERENVERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMINOSAEUREN
Former [2000/36]PROCESS FOR CONSTRUCTING AMINO ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AMINO ACID BY FERMENTATION METHOD WITH THE USE OF THE THUS CONSTRUCTED AMINO ACID-PRODUCING BACTERIUM
Former [2000/36]PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE BACTERIE PRODUISANT DES ACIDES AMINES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES AMINES PAR UNE TECHNIQUE DE FERMENTATION UTILISANT LADITE BACTERIE
Entry into regional phase16.05.2000Translation filed 
16.05.2000National basic fee paid 
16.05.2000Search fee paid 
16.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
08.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2008Observations by third parties
27.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2008Observations by third parties
06.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2009Fee for grant paid
02.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
GR29.01.2010
PT01.03.2010
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
DK28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/29]AT28.10.2009
BE28.10.2009
CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
PT01.03.2010
Former [2010/28]CY28.10.2009
FI28.10.2009
SE28.10.2009
PT01.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0771879  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,16 * See page 5 (lines 18-57), and page 7 (lines 3-8) *
 [Y]  - PATEK ET AL, "Promoters from Corynebacterium glutamicum: cloning, molecular analysis and search for a consensus motif", MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 142, pages 1297 - 1309, XP008006983 [Y] 1,2,16 * See page 1301 (Fig. 1) and pages 1305-1307 (Discussion) *
 [Y]  - GUERRERO ET AL, "Directed mutagenesis of a regulatory palindromic sequence upstream from the Brevibacterium lactofermentum tryptophan operon", GENE, (1994), vol. 138, pages 35 - 41, XP002285948 [Y] 1,2,16 * See page 40 (Conclusions) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90780-3
 [Y]  - SANO ET AL, "Structure and function of the trp operon control regions of Brevibacterium lactofermentum, a glutamic-acid-producing bacterium", GENE, (1987), vol. 53, pages 191 - 200, XP002285949 [Y] 1,2,16 * See pages 191-192 (Introduction), page 194 (Fig. 2), and page 199 (Discussion) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(87)90007-2
International search[X]JPH06502548  ;
 [A]JPS63214189  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND)
 [AP]  - FOURNIER B. ET AL., "Strength and regulation of the different promoters for chromosomal beta-lactamases of Klebsiella Oxytoca", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199904), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 850 - 855, XP002925899
 [AP]  - JEFFKE T. ET AL., "Mutational analysis of the cbb operon (C02 assimilation) promoter of Ralstonia eutropha", J. BACTERIOL., (199907), vol. 181, no. 14, pages 4374 - 4380, XP002925900
ExaminationWO9807846
    - EL-MANSI, "Control of metabolic interconversion of isocitrate dehydrogenase between the catalytically active and inactive forms in Escherichia coli", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, (1998), vol. 166, pages 333 - 339,
    - ALVAREZ-VILLAFAÑE ET AL, "Two NAD(+)-isocitrate dehydrogenase forms in Phycomyces blakesleeanus. Induction in response to acetate growth and characterization, kinetics, and regulation of both enzyme forms", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 4741 - 4752, XP002101727

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi951268j
    - MORINAGA ET AL, "Expression of Escherichia coli promoters in Brevibacterium lactofermentum using the shuttle vector pEB003", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 305 - 312, XP023944337

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(87)90027-7
    - BECKER ET AL (RED), LEXIKON DER BIOLOGIE, Siebenter Band (Praealpin bis Spindelstrauch) -> Stichwort/headword "Promotor, HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, ISBN 3-86025-156-2, SPEKTRUM, AKADEMISCHER VERLAG,
    - STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FOR APPEAL, T 0390/07, EPO, München, Germany,
by applicant   - J. MOL. BIOL., (1980), vol. 143, page 161,
otherWO9807846
    - MORINAGA Y. ET AL, "Expression of Escheridia coli promoters in Brevibacterium lactofermentum using the shuttle vector pEB003", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 305 - 312, XP003023197

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(87)90027-7