Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1112479

EP1112479 - AUTOMATED REMOVAL OF EMBEDDING MEDIA FROM BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/27]REMOVAL OF EMBEDDING MEDIA FROM BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES AND CELL CONDITIONING ON AUTOMATED STAINING INSTRUMENTS
[2018/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 E. Innovation Park Drive
Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US
[2018/33]
Former [2009/45]For all designated states
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 E. Innovation Park Drive
Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 E. Innovation Park Drive
Tuscon, Arizona 85755 / US
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
VENTANA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.
1910 Innovation Park Drive
Tucson, AZ 85737 / US
Former [2001/27]For all designated states
VENTANA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.
3865 Business Center Court
Tucson, AZ 85705 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTENSEN, Kimberly
8742 E. Waverly
Tucson, AZ 85712 / US
02 / MACREA, Ethel
4740 N. Brookview Drive
Tucson, AZ 85705 / US
03 / SEBASTIAO, Noemi
1500 Pusch Wilderness Drive 4206
Oro Valley, AZ 85737 / US
 [2001/27]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2018/33]
Former [2001/27]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99945510.803.09.1999
[2001/27]
WO1999US20353
Priority number, dateUS19980099018P03.09.1998         Original published format: US 99018 P
US1999025924026.02.1999         Original published format: US 259240
WO1999US0418126.02.1999         Original published format: PCT/US99/04181
[2001/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0014507
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1112479
Date:04.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1112479
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/30, G01N1/31, G01N1/36, G01N35/10
[2018/12]
Former International [2002/50]G01N1/30, G01N1/31
Former International [2001/27]G01N1/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2018/33]
Former [2001/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ENTFERNUNG VON EINBETTUNGSMEDIEN VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN[2018/13]
English:AUTOMATED REMOVAL OF EMBEDDING MEDIA FROM BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES[2018/13]
French:EXTRACTION AUTOMATIQUE DES MILIEUX D'INCORPORATION D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES[2018/13]
Former [2001/27]ENTFERNUNG VON EINBETTUNGSMEDIEN AUS BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN UND ZELLKONDITIONIERUNG VON AUTOMATISCHEN FÄRBEINSTRUMENTEN
Former [2001/27]REMOVAL OF EMBEDDING MEDIA FROM BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES AND CELL CONDITIONING ON AUTOMATED STAINING INSTRUMENTS
Former [2001/27]EXTRACTION DES MILIEUX D'INCORPORATION D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES ET CONDITIONNEMENT CELLULAIRE SUR DES INSTRUMENTS DE COLORATION AUTOMATIQUE
Entry into regional phase02.04.2001National basic fee paid 
02.04.2001Search fee paid 
02.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
13.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.07.2018Fee for grant paid
05.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination12.11.2008Appeal received No.  T1012/09
27.02.2009Statement of grounds filed
03.07.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2006
Opposition(s)16.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
FR15.10.2018
GB15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
[2020/03]
Former [2019/39]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
FR15.10.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/38]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
FR15.10.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/30]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
LU03.09.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/28]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
MC15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AT15.08.2018
DK15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/13]AT15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
GR16.11.2018
Former [2019/09]FI15.08.2018
NL15.08.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9524498  (BIOGENEX LAB [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 7 * * page 10, lines 16-25 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [X]EP0508568  (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * pages 8-13 *;
 [Y]US5187099  (HEALY JR STEPHEN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5318795  (STOKES BARRY O [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * columns 1-4 *;
 [X]US5344637  (CAMIENER GERALD W [US]) [X] 24-27 * abstract * * claims 1,2,6-10 *;
 [X]WO9404906  (BIOGENEX LAB [US], et al) [X] 24-27 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 11 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 8 *;
 [X]US5244787  (KEY MARC E [US], et al) [X] 29-37 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 33 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 2 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US5439649  (TSEUNG KEN [US], et al) [X] 29-37 * column 2, lines 36-68 * * column 3, lines 11-23 * * column 3, lines 52-56 * * column 5, lines 31-48 * * column 6, lines 41-60 * * column 15, line 58 - column 16, line 18 *;
 [A]US5695942  (FARMILO A JAMES [CA], et al) [A] 29,30,32-37 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5273905  (MULLER UWE R [US], et al);
 [Y]US4043292  (ROGERS CHARLES H, et al);
 [Y]US5023187  (KOEBLER DOUGLAS J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5614376  (COPLEY DIANNE M [US], et al)