Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018080

EP1018080 - METHOD FOR INTERFACING SCANNED PRODUCT INFORMATION WITH A SOURCE FOR THE PRODUCT OVER A GLOBAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.12.2012  [2012/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RPX-LV Acquisition LLC
c/o Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington DE 19808 / US
[2010/02]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Digitalconvergence Com Inc.
4264 Kellway Circle
Addison, TX 75244 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PHILYAW, Jeffry, Jovan
5968 West Northwest Highway, No. 1813
Dallas, TX 75225 / US
02 / MATHEWS, David, Kent
3438 Livingston Lane
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
03 / SMITH, Brad, Maxwell
4016 Hackmore Loop
Irving, TX 75061 / US
04 / ADAMS, Paul, Scovell
7419 Gracefield Lane
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date99945622.109.09.1999
[2000/28]
WO1999US20694
Priority number, dateUS1998015147111.09.1998         Original published format: US 151471
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0016211
Date:23.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018080
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search reportUS23.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/163, G06F13/14
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
Extension statesAL17.11.1999
LT17.11.1999
LV17.11.1999
MK17.11.1999
RO17.11.1999
SI17.11.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER SCHNITTSTELLE AUF EINEM GLOBALEN NETZWERK ZWISCHEN EINER ABGETASTETEN PRODUKTINFORMATION UND EINER BEZUGSQUELLE DES PRODUKTS[2000/28]
English:METHOD FOR INTERFACING SCANNED PRODUCT INFORMATION WITH A SOURCE FOR THE PRODUCT OVER A GLOBAL NETWORK[2000/28]
French:PROCEDE D'INTERFA AGE D'INFORMATIONS DE PRODUIT LUES OPTIQUEMENT AVEC UNE SOURCE DU PRODUIT SUR UN RESEAU MONDIAL[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1999National basic fee paid 
17.11.1999Search fee paid 
17.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
11.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/49]
14.05.2012Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/49]
20.07.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9701137  (SOLAR COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - line 24 * * page 5, line 12 - line 25 * * column 12, line 16 - column 13, line 10 * * column 13, line 36 - column 14, line 3 * * column 14, line 4 - line L * * column 15, line 10 - line 23 * * column 18, line 2 - line 13 *;
 [X]WO9803923  (ERNESTINE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 13 * * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 5; claims 5-7,9,12,13,15,48 *;
 [X]WO9838761  (NEOMEDIA TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12,14 * page 13, line 5 - page 15, line 9; figure 2 *;
 [PX]WO9849813  (PARRY RHYS EVAN [US]) [PX] 1-14 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 5 * * page 10, line 23 - line 27 *
International search[X]US5640193  (WELLNER PIERRE DAVID [US]);
 [Y]US5604682  (MCLAUGHLIN ROBERT [US], et al);
 [Y]US5572643  (JUDSON DAVID H [US]);
 [Y]US5047614  (BIANCO JAMES S [US])
by applicantWO9701137