Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048123

EP1048123 - PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BARNARD, Michael, E.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Tangena, Antonius Gerardus , et al
Philips Electronics UK Ltd.
Cross Oak Lane
Red Hill
Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Tangena, Antonius Gerardus , et al
Philips Electronics UK Ltd., Cross Oak Lane
Red Hill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date99946000.918.08.1999
[2000/44]
WO1999EP06101
Priority number, dateGB1998001884029.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9818840
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0013329
Date:09.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048123
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/38, H04B5/02, G06F1/16
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
TitleGerman:PERSÖNLICHES KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT[2000/44]
English:PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS[2000/44]
French:APPAREIL PORTABLE DE COMMUNICATION[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2000National basic fee paid 
11.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
23.11.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9827702  (GHASSABIAN FIROOZ [IL]) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * page 7, line 1 - page 12, line 27; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH10229357  ;
 [A]EP0824889  (BURATTO ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY S [IT]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 37 *;
 [A]GB2308481  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [DY]  - FUKUMOTO M ET AL, "BODY COUPLED FINGERING: WIRELESS WEARABLE KEYBOARD", CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS,US,NEW YORK, ACM, (1997), ISBN 0-89791-802-9, pages 147 - 154, XP000697121 [DY] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/258549.258636
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, [A] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ZIMMERMAN T G, "PERSONAL AREA NETWORKS: NEAR-FIELD INTRABODY COMMUNICATION", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL,US,IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, (19960101), vol. 35, no. 3/04, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 609 - 617, XP000635090 [A] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - POST ET AL, "Intrabody buses for data and power", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 1ST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WEARABLE COMPUTERS;CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA OCT 13-14 1997, International Symposium on Wearable Computers, Digest of Papers 1997 IEEE Comp Soc, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, (1997), pages 52 - 55, XP002129145 [DA] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISWC.1997.629919