Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033034

EP1033034 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING A DIGITAL DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grundig Multimedia B.V.
De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg
1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Grundig Multimedia B.V.
De Boelelaan 7 Off. I 2hg
1083HJ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2000/50]For all designated states
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft
Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft
Kurgartenstrasse 37
90762 Fürth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HORN, Bernhard
Birkensteig 18
D-91301 Forchheim / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Rechtsanwalt
Grundig Intermedia GmbH
Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Rechtsanwalt Grundig Intermedia GmbH Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/50]Pröll, Jürgen
GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft, R-L 1, Patentabteilung, Beuthener Strasse 41
90471 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/36]Pröll, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Grundig AG, Patentabteilung
90748 Fürth / DE
Application number, filing date99947284.807.09.1999
[2000/36]
WO1999EP06586
Priority number, dateDE199814137110.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19841371
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0016547
Date:23.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033034
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/00, H04L7/04
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES DIGITALEN DATENSTROMES[2000/36]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING A DIGITAL DATA STREAM[2000/36]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'UN FLUX DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2000National basic fee paid 
31.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
04.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.06.2007
04.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/42]
14.06.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/42]
21.06.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US5742361  (NAKASE JUNKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * column A * * column 1, line 34 - line 55 * * column 17, line 31 - column 18, line 10 *;
 [A]JPH10174072  ;
 [A]US5708689  (SHIN JEONG-CHEOL [KR]) [A] 1,14 * column A * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 17 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10174072 A 19980626 (SAMSUNG ELECTRON CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract *