Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1119997

EP1119997 - IDENTIFYING A MOBILE STATION IN A PACKET RADIO NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  08.04.2012
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2012Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 09.05.2012  [2012/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust
Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company
National Association
919 North Market Street, Suite 1600
Wilmington DE 19801 / US
[2012/02]
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HAUMONT, Serge
Riistavuorenkuja 3 B 10
FIN-00320 Helsinki / FI
 [2001/31]
Representative(s)Virkkala, Antero Jukka , et al
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2001/31]Virkkala, Jukka Antero , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99947502.305.10.1999
[2001/31]
WO1999FI00825
Priority number, dateFI1998000216606.10.1998         Original published format: FI 982166
[2001/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0021319
Date:13.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1119997
Date:01.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000
[2001/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1119997
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04L12/56
[2001/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MOBILSTATION IN EINEM PAKETFUNKNETZ[2001/31]
English:IDENTIFYING A MOBILE STATION IN A PACKET RADIO NETWORK[2001/31]
French:IDENTIFICATION D'UNE STATION MOBILE DANS UN RESEAU DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION PAR PAQUETS[2001/31]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2001National basic fee paid 
30.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
30.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2004Fee for grant paid
21.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.12.2005  07.10.2008  WITHDRAWN
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al
Hirsch & Associés
58, Avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2008/47]
Opponent(s)01  09.12.2005  07.10.2008  WITHDRAWN
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al
Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/05]
Opponent(s)01  09.12.2005   
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie, et al
Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
20.01.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.05.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.12.2011Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
29.12.2011Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
CY05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
[2007/23]
Former [2006/49]CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
IE05.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/30]CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
MC31.10.2005
Former [2006/14]CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
Former [2006/12]CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
Former [2005/46]FI09.03.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0859531  ;
 [A]WO9916036  ;
 [A]WO9733403