Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1117505

EP1117505 - MULTIFUNCTION INSERT PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arrighi, Claudio
Via Vicinale Macchia, 27, Fraz. Marina
54036 Carrara / IT
[2001/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/30]
Representative(s)Bardini, Marco Luigi , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti SpA
Corso dei Tintori, 25
50122 Firenze / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/30]Bardini, Marco Luigi , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. 25 Corso dei Tintori
50122 Firenze FI / IT
Application number, filing date99947846.427.09.1999
[2001/30]
WO1999IT00304
Priority number, dateIT1998MS0000828.09.1998         Original published format: IT MS980008
[2001/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0018539
Date:06.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1117505
Date:25.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1117505
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23P19/06, B21J13/00, B21J15/12, B30B15/30, B21D55/00, F16P3/00
[2001/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/30]
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONSPRESSE FÜR EINSATZSTÜCKE[2001/30]
English:MULTIFUNCTION INSERT PRESS[2001/30]
French:PRESSE A INSERTS MULTIFONCTION[2001/30]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999Translation filed 
11.04.2001National basic fee paid 
11.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2003Fee for grant paid
15.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY27.09.2003
LU27.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/40]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY27.09.2003
LU27.09.2003
IE29.09.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY27.09.2003
LU27.09.2003
Former [2004/36]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
CY27.09.2003
Former [2004/29]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
DK18.09.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
Former [2004/13]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
PT18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
SE18.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
FI18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT18.06.2003
CH18.06.2003
LI18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
GR18.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US3818748  (SMIT H) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2904935  (WAGNER JOHANN) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US3934777  (KRAMER FRIEDHELM, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 26; figure - *