Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1114310

EP1114310 - X-RAY FLUORESCENCE ELEMENTAL ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Katz, Elisabeth
Ahornweg 8
72226 Simmersfeld / DE
[2003/35]
Former [2001/28]For all designated states
Process Control, Inc.
Three Christian Centre, 201 West Walnut Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAURILA, Melvin, J.
540 Big Bear Lane
Lexington, KY 40517 / US
02 / BACHMANN, Claus, C.
Silcherst 41
D-75323 Bad Wilbad / DE
03 / KLEIN, Albert, P.
Ahornweg 8
D-72226 Simmersfeld / DE
 [2001/28]
Representative(s)Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Schön, Thilo , et al
Patentanwälte Frank Wacker Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2012/14]Frank, Gerhard , et al
Patentanwälte, Mayer Frank Schön, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2003/35]Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte, Mayer Frank Schön, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2001/28]Long, Edward Anthony , et al
Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
Application number, filing date99948188.016.09.1999
[2001/28]
WO1999US20867
Priority number, dateUS1998015607817.09.1998         Original published format: US 156078
[2001/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0016078
Date:23.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1114310
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000
[2001/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1114310
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.03.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/223, G01V5/00
[2005/44]
Former International [2001/28]G01N23/223
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/28]
TitleGerman:RÖNTGENFLUORESZEUGOMALYSEGERÄT[2001/28]
English:X-RAY FLUORESCENCE ELEMENTAL ANALYZER[2001/28]
French:DISPOSITIF SERVANT A ANALYSER DES ELEMENTS PAR FLUORESCENCE X[2001/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2001National basic fee paid 
27.03.2001Search fee paid 
27.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/28]
01.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2011
02.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.02.2012Fee for grant paid
15.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.01.2013  17.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag
701 91 Örebro / SE
Opponent's representative
Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
 [2019/21]
Former [2018/24]
Opponent(s)01  04.01.2013  17.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag
701 91 Örebro / SE
Opponent's representative
Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2016/03]
Opponent(s)01  04.01.2013  17.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Atlas Copco Rock Drills AB
701 91 Örebro / SE
Opponent's representative
Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/07]
Opponent(s)01  04.01.2013   
Atlas Copco Rock Drills AB
701 91 Örebro / SE
Opponent's representative
Langenskiöld, Tord Karl Walter
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
12.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.06.2013Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2013Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
27.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1492/17
15.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1492/17
05.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.09.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
15.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2001AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
29.05.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
GB16.09.2018
SE17.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
DK30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
NL01.10.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/47]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
GB16.09.2018
SE17.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
NL01.10.2018
Former [2019/39]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
SE17.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
NL01.10.2018
Former [2019/30]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
SE17.09.2018
NL01.10.2018
Former [2019/24]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
SE17.09.2018
Former [2014/27]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
LU16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/33]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE16.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE04.04.2012
CY04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
PT06.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY04.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5750883  (ELDER ET AL) [X] 1-5,11,12,21,22 * column 3, line 28 - line 34; figures 2,3 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 16; figure 10 * [Y] 6-10,18-20;
 [Y]US4788853  (BELL ET AL) [Y] 8-10,18-20 * column 1, line 8 - line 12; figure 3 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 4 *;
 [X]US4015124  (PAGE ET AL) [X] 13 * column 3, line 41 - line 55; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3982125  (RODER ET AL) [A] 13 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4918315  (GOMBERG ET AL) [A] 13 * column 19, line 37 - line 42; figure 6 *
 [Y]  - "ON-LINE X-RAY FLUORESCENCE ANALYSIS OF LIQUIDS, SLURRIES AND PASTES", X-RAY ANALYSERS IN PROCESS CONTROL, (199002), pages 38 - 45,80, XP002923679 [Y] 6,7 * page 82, paragraph 2 - page 85, paragraph 2; figure 31 *
International search[X]US4486894  ;
 [X]US5750883  ;
 [Y]US3864570  ;
 [Y]US4550768  ;
 [Y]US4882927  ;
 [Y]US5646354
 [Y]  - "ON-LINE X-RAY FLUORESCENCE ANALYSIS OF LIQUIDS, SLURRIES AND PASTES", X-RAY ANALYSERS IN PROCESS CONTROL, XX, XX, XX, (19900201), pages 38 - 45 + 80, XP002923679