Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1116406

EP1116406 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAPID ASSIGNMENT OF A TRAFFIC CHANNEL IN DIGITAL CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM INCORPORATED
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2006/43]
Former [2001/29]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENDER, Paul, E.
2879 Angell Avenue
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / GROB, Matthew, S.
2757 Bordeaux Avenue
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
03 / KARMI, Gadi
10968 Corte Playa Barcelona
San Diego, CA 92124 / US
 [2001/29]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/30]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2001/29]Whitten, George Alan , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99948326.617.09.1999
[2001/29]
WO1999US21651
Priority number, dateUS1998015869722.09.1998         Original published format: US 158697
[2001/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0018172
Date:30.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1116406
Date:18.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000
[2001/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1116406
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22
[2001/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2001/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR SCHNELLE ZUWEISUNG EINES NACHRICHTEN-KANALS IN DIGITALEN ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME[2001/29]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAPID ASSIGNMENT OF A TRAFFIC CHANNEL IN DIGITAL CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS[2001/29]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'AFFECTATION RAPIDE D'UN CANAL DE TRAFIC DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE NUMERIQUE[2001/29]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2001National basic fee paid 
19.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
03.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2006Fee for grant paid
22.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)26.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US5673259  (QUICK JR ROY F [US]) [A] 1,21,27 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 62 * * column 7, line 22 - line 27 * * column 8, line 21 - column 10, line 9 * * column 10, line 54 - line 67 * * column 11, line 60 - column 13, line 32 * * column 14, line 13 - line 47 * * column 15, line 8 - column 17, line 21 * * column 18, line 41 - column 22, line 20 *;
 [A]US5802465  (HAMALAINEN JARI [FI], et al) [A] 1,21,27 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 8 * * column 5, line 1 - line 34 * * column 6, line 15 - column 9, line 13 * * column 11, line 9 - line 59 *;
 [A]EP0765096  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1,27,28 * column 2, line 21 - line 40 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 17 * * column 7, line 26 - line 39 * * column 15, line 33 - column 16, line 4 *;
 [A]US5544196  (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 44 * * column 5, line 14 - line 36 * * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 15 *