Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP1116042 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP98118302 EP9907189W EP99948884 JP2000572677 KR20017003953



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3605361BGlobal Dossier 22.12.2004B2
JP2002525888 13.08.2002A
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1116042Global Dossier 12.03.2003B1
EP1116042 18.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP99948884 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ATE234472T 15.03.2003T1
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9914083 24.07.2001A
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59904556D1 17.04.2003D1
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA55561 15.04.2003C2
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6601202 29.07.2003B2
US2001025355 27.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
EP9907189 28.09.1999
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0019224Global Dossier 06.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100408123BGlobal Dossier 18.12.2003B1
KR20010075423 09.08.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0992809Global Dossier 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1145039C 07.04.2004C
CN1320214 31.10.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2195616T 01.12.2003T3
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2211457 27.08.2003C2
Priority number Date
EP98118302 28.09.1998