Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046166

EP1046166 - INFORMATION CARRIER WITH A COMPACT HEADER FORMAT AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SPRUIT, Johannes, H., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus , et al
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99948957.828.09.1999
[2000/43]
WO1999EP07460
Priority number, dateEP1998020354721.10.1998         Original published format: EP 98203547
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0023995
Date:27.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046166
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000
[2000/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/12
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/43]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSTRÄGER MIT EINEM KOMPAKTEN KOPFFORMAT UND GERÄT DAFÜR[2000/43]
English:INFORMATION CARRIER WITH A COMPACT HEADER FORMAT AND APPARATUS[2000/43]
French:SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS DOTE D'UN FORMAT D'EN-TETE COMPACT, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2000National basic fee paid 
08.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
24.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/41]
12.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5740154  (IZUMI HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 3,7,9 * * column 4, line 49 - line 57 * * column 6, line 25 - line 39 * * column 7, line 13 - line 28 * * column 8, line 19 - line 21 *;
 [X]EP0740290  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 30 * * column 7, line 21 - line 38 * * column 8, line 45 - line 52 *;
 [A]EP0757343  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5-7 * column 22, line 34 - column 24, line 26 * * figures 10B,11,12 *;
 [A]JPH05197956
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931117), vol. 017, no. 624, Database accession no. (P - 1646), [A] 5,6 * abstract *