Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1131802

EP1131802 - SMOKE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VSD Limited
C/o Intelligent Security, Ltd., The Surrey Research Park, Surrey Technology Centre, 40 Occam Road
Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
VSD Limited
Intelligent Security, Ltd., The Surrey Research Park, Surrey Technology Centre, 40 Occam Road
Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / GRECH-CINI, Henry Joseph
2 Charlton Court, Drummond Road
Guildford, Surrey GU1 4NU / GB
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Jones, William
Ip21 Limited
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/37]Jones, William
i.p.21 Limited Norwich Research Park
Colney Norwich NR4 7UT / GB
Former [2004/03]Leaman, Keith , et al
fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Former [2001/37]Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date99949260.620.10.1999
[2001/37]
WO1999GB03459
Priority number, dateGB1998002295620.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9822956
[2001/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0023959
Date:27.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1131802
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1131802
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/194
[2001/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/37]
TitleGerman:RAUCHMELDUNG[2001/37]
English:SMOKE DETECTION[2001/37]
French:DETECTION DE FUMEE[2001/37]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2001National basic fee paid 
14.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
17.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2002Fee for grant paid
15.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.06.2003   
Securiton AG
Alpenstrasse 20
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
Opponent's representative
Börjes-Pestalozza, Henrich
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/34]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2003   
Securiton AG
Alpenstrasse 20
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
Opponent's representative
Börjes-Pestalozza, Heinrich
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
07.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/01]
02.08.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.08.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.05.2003
GB20.10.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.05.2003
GB20.10.2003
Former [2006/44]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.05.2003
GB20.10.2003
Former [2006/14]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
GB20.10.2003
Former [2004/45]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
FR18.07.2003
GB20.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU20.10.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
FR18.07.2003
Former [2004/10]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
IE21.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
FR18.07.2003
Former [2004/05]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
IE21.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/03]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
IE21.10.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/48]AT25.09.2002
BE25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/30]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5237308  (TETSUYA NAKAMURA) [X] 1,2,8-10 * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9716926  (DAVID SARNOFF RESEARCH CENTER) [X] 1,2,8 * page 6, line 9 - page 8, line 23 *