Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043615

EP1043615 - OPTICAL HEAD AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Kenji Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
02 / OHSATO, Kiyoshi Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Körber, Wolfhart
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patentanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Körber, Wolfhart
Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2000/41]Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99949382.822.10.1999
[2000/41]
WO1999JP05856
Priority number, dateJP1998030148022.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30148098
[2000/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0023841
Date:27.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1043615
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000
[2000/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.04.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:G02B13/00, G11B7/135, // G11B7/00
[2007/02]
Former International [2000/41]G02B13/00, G11B7/135
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER KOPF UND AUFNAHME-/WIEDERGABE-VORRICHTUNG[2009/16]
English:OPTICAL HEAD AND RECORDING/REPRODUCING DEVICE[2000/41]
French:TETE OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT/LECTURE[2000/41]
Former [2000/41]OPTISCHER KOPF UND AUFNAHME/WIEDERGABE-VORRICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase16.06.2000Translation filed 
16.06.2000National basic fee paid 
16.06.2000Search fee paid 
16.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
24.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
10.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5818643  (FUJIOKA YOSHISATO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 25 - line 38 * * column 7, line 48 - line 50 * * column 9, line 14 - line 27 * * figures 22,42 * * tables 9-23 *;
 [Y]EP0545713  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 3,10 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [Y]US5202867  (MATSUI HIROSHI [US], et al) [Y] 5,11 * tables 1-3 * * column 3, line 29 - line 34 *
 [Y]  YAMAMOTO, K., OSATO, K., ICHIMURA, I., MAEDA, F., "0.8-Numerical-Aperture Two-Element Objective Lens for the Optical Disk", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (199701), vol. 36, no. 1B, pages 456 - 459, XP002926118 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.36.456
International search[X]JPH09197264  (MARK KK)
 [Y]  - YAMAMOTO K. ET AL., "0.8-Numerical-Aperture Two-Element Objective Lens for the Optical Disk", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1, (199701), vol. 36, no. 1B, pages 456 - 459, XP002926118

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.36.456
 [X]  - FUJIOKA Y., "Objective Lens System for Variable Thickness of Disk Base", OPTICAL REVIEW, (199803), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 109 - 114, XP002926119

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10043-998-0109-6