Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1110205

EP1110205 - INTERACTIVE USER INTERFACE USING SPEECH RECOGNITION AND NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
One Voice Technologies Inc.
6333 Greenwich Drive, Suite 240
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
One Voice Technologies Inc.
6333 Greenwich Drive, Suite 240
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Dean, C.
11422 Cypress Terrace Place
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]Flint, Adam
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99949601.108.09.1999
[2001/26]
WO1999US20445
Priority number, dateUS1998015045909.09.1998         Original published format: US 150459
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0014727
Date:16.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1110205
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000
[2001/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1110205
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/18
[2001/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERAKTIVE ANWENDERSCHNITTSTELLE MIT SPRACHERKENNUNG UND NATURSPRACHENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2001/26]
English:INTERACTIVE USER INTERFACE USING SPEECH RECOGNITION AND NATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING[2001/26]
French:INTERFACE D'UTILISATEUR INTERACTIVE UTILISANT LA RECONNAISSANCE DE LA PAROLE ET LE TRAITEMENT DU LANGAGE NATUREL[2001/26]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2001National basic fee paid 
29.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
04.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2004Fee for grant paid
06.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
CY08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2008/23]
Former [2008/18]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
CY08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2007/23]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
CY08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/40]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
IE08.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/22]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/48]FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI12.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0834862  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,3,10-12,17,18,20,27-29,34 * page 2, lines 10-14 * * page 2, lines 25-29 * * page 2, lines 56-58 * * page 3, lines 31-48 *;
 [A]US5311429  (TOMINAGA MASASUKE [JP]) [A] 15,16,32,33 * abstract * * column 2, lines 35-39 * * column 2, lines 44-50 * * column 3, lines 22-56 *;
 [A]JPH0844384
 [A]  - "APPROXIMATE WORD-SPOTTING METHOD FOR CONSTRAINED GRAMMARS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19941010), vol. 37, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, page 385, XP000475707 [A] 1,6-9,18,23-26 * page 385, lines 4-6 * * page 385, lines 12-16 *
 [A]  - "SPREADSHEET PROGRAM ACCEPTING CONTINUOUS-SPEECH INPUT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19951212), vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0018-8689, page 357-359, XP000588170 [A] 1,3,10,17,18,20,27,34 * page 357, lines 3-5 * * page 358, lines 5-7 * * page 358, lines 18-20 * * page 358, lines 33-35 *
 [A]  - "TECHNIQUES FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19951212), vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0018-8689, page 341-342, XP000588164 [A] 1,3,17,18,20,34 * page 341, lines 14-17 * * page 341, lines 35-37 * * page 342, lines 11-14 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08044384 A 19960216 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,10-16,18,27-33 * abstract *