Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1115417

EP1115417 - USE OF DAPTOMYCIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/29]METHODS FOR ADMINISTRATION OF ANTIBIOTICS
[2005/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2016Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
10.10.2016Change: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
10.10.2016New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
65 Hayden Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
[2006/12]
Former [2001/29]For all designated states
Cubist Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
24 Emily Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OLESON, Frederick, B., Jr.
5 Partridge Lane
Concord, MA 01742 / US
02 / TALLY, Francis, P.
336 Hemlock Circle
Lincoln, MA 01733 / US
 [2001/29]
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2007/31]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2001/29]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99949913.024.09.1999
[2001/29]
WO1999US22366
Priority number, dateUS19980101828P25.09.1998         Original published format: US 101828 P
US19990125750P24.03.1999         Original published format: US 125750 P
[2001/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0018419
Date:06.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1115417
Date:18.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000
[2001/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1115417
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/12
[2005/46]
Former International [2001/29]A61K38/12, A61K38/08, // (A61K38/08, 38:05)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/29]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SI25.04.2001
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON DAPTOMYCIN[2005/45]
English:USE OF DAPTOMYCIN[2005/45]
French:UTILISATION DE DAPTOMYCIN[2005/45]
Former [2001/29]METHODEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON ANTIBIOTIKA
Former [2001/29]METHODS FOR ADMINISTRATION OF ANTIBIOTICS
Former [2001/29]METHODES D'ADMINISTRATION D'ANTIBIOTIQUES
Entry into regional phase25.04.2001National basic fee paid 
25.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
17.09.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2006Fee for grant paid
16.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06006697.4  / EP1674107
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLATE SCHWEITZER ZOUNEK
Rheingaustrasse 196
D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Schweitzer, Klaus
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sölch, Günter
Nordring 27
83624 Otterfing / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/50]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
PLATE SCHWEITZER ZOUNEK
Rheingaustrasse 196
D-65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Schweitzer, Klaus
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sölch, Günter
Nordring 27
83624 Otterfing / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/18]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
ZOUNEK PLATE SCHWEITZER
Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  05.01.2007  17.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Sölch, Günter
Nordring 27
83624 Otterfing / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/07]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2007   
ZOUNEK PLATE SCHWEITER
Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  05.01.2007   
Sölch, Günter
Nordring 27
83624 Otterfing / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
09.02.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
01.09.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.09.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.11.2014Appeal received No.  T2154/14
12.01.2015Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2009Appeal received No.  T0612/09
27.05.2009Statement of grounds filed
11.04.2013Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
21.07.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/30]
30.09.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/40]
10.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
11.04.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
28.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2016/42]
Former [2016/35]CY24.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0386951  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1-10,16-26,32,34-43,49-60 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9822107  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [A] 27-31,61-65 * claim - *;
 [PX]WO9930728  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 33 * page 5, line 33 - line 35 *;
 [DA]  - J.R. WOODWORTH ET AL., "SINGLE-DOSE PHARMACOKINETICS AND ANTIBACTERIAL ACTIVITY OF DAPTOMYCIN, A NEW LIPOPEPTIDE ANTIBIOTIC, IN HEALTHY VOLUNTEERS.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, BETHESDA, US, (199202), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 318 - 325, XP000891776 [DA] 1-10,16-26,32,34-43,49-60 * page 321, column L, line 25 - line 26; tables 2,3 * * page 324, column R, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - J.R. WOODWORTH ET AL., "TOBRAMYCIN AND DAPTOMYCIN DISPOSITION WHEN CO-ADMINISTERED TO HEALTHY VOLUNTEERS", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, LONDON, GB, (199403), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 655 - 659, XP000891828 [A] 11-15,44-48 * page 656, paragraph 2 * * page 658, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jac/33.3.655
 [X]  - E. BERNARD ET AL., "PHARMACOKINETICS AND SUCTION BLISTER FLUID PENETRATION OF A SEMISYNTHETIC INJECTABLE STREPTOGRAMIN RP 59500 (RP 57669/RP 54476)", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY & INFECTIOUS DISEASES,DE,WIESBADEN, (19940901), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 768 - 771, XP002037989 [X] 33 * page 770, column R, paragraph 9 - paragraph 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01973993
 [DPX]  - F.P. TALLY ET AL., "DAPTOMYCIN: A NOVEL AGENT FOR GRAM-POSITIVE INFECTIONS.", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (199908), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 1223 - 1228, XP000891801 [DPX] 1-5,11-15,34-38,44-48 * page 1228, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1229, column L, line 2; table 4 * * page 1232, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1235, column R, paragraph 2; tables 10,11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.8.8.1223
 [PA]  - R.C. MOELLERING ET AL., "THE EFFICACY AND SAFETY OF QUINUPRISTIN/DALFOPRISTIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFECTIONS CAUSED BY VANCOMYCIN-RESISTANT ENTEROCOCCUS FAECIUM.", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, london, gb, (199908), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 251 - 261, XP000891830 [PA] 27-31,61-65 * page 252, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 257, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jac/44.2.251