Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034196

EP1034196 - CATALYST AND METHODS FOR POLYMERIZING CYCLOOLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Promerus LLC
9921 Brecksville Road
Brecksville, OH 44141 / US
For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
304 Old Main
University Park, PA 16802-7000 / US
[2003/22]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US
For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
304 Old Main
University Park, PA 16802-7000 / US
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
4020 Kinross Lakes Parkway
Richfield, Ohio 44286-9368 / US
For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
304 Old Main
University Park, PA 16802-7000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIPIAN, John-Henry
Apartm. 206, 12631 Walnut Hills Drive
North Royalton, OH 44133 / US
02 / RHODES, Larry, F.
3036 Vincent Road
Silverlake, OH 44224 / US
03 / GOODALL, Brian, L., The Albemarle Corporation
Res.rch and Develop., 8000 GSRI Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US
04 / BELL, Andrew
1511 Lewis Drive
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
05 / MIMNA, Richard, A.
2301 South Overlook
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
06 / FONDRAN, John, C.
Apartment 1, 2504 Derbyshire Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
07 / HENNIS, April, D.
626 South Pugh Street
State College, PA 16801 / US
08 / ELIA, Christine, N.
1231 South Allen Street
State College, PA 16801 / US
09 / POLLEY, Jennifer, D.
204 Kent Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
10 / SEN, Ayusman
1529 Chaumont Avenue
State College, PA 16801 / US
11 / SAIKUMAR, Jayaraman
12185 Waywood Drive
Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US
[2000/45]
Former [2000/37]01 / LIPIAN, John-Henry
Apartm. 206, 12631 Walnut Hills Drive
North Royalton, OH 44133 / US
02 / RHODES, Larry, F.
3036 Vincent Road
Silverlake, OH 44224 / US
03 / GOODALL, Brian, L., The Albemarle Corporation
Res.rch and Develop., 8000 GSRI Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US
04 / BELL, Andrew
1511 Lewis Drive
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
05 / MIMNA, Richard, A.
Apartment 1, 2679 Hampshire Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
06 / FONDRAN, John, C.
Apartment 1, 2504 Derbyshire Road
Cleveland Heights, OH 44106 / US
07 / HENNIS, April, D.
626 South Pugh Street
State College, PA 16801 / US
08 / ELIA, Christine, N.
1231 South Allen Street
State College, PA 16801 / US
09 / POLLEY, Jennifer, D.
204 Kent Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
10 / SEN, Ayusman
1529 Chaumont Avenue
State College, PA 16801 / US
11 / SAIKUMAR, Jayaraman
12185 Waywood Drive
Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99950213.105.10.1999
[2000/37]
WO1999US23243
Priority number, dateUS19980103120P05.10.1998         Original published format: US 103120 P
US19980111590P09.12.1998         Original published format: US 111590 P
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0020472
Date:13.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034196
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034196
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08F32/08, C08F4/70
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON CYCLOOLEFINEN[2000/37]
English:CATALYST AND METHODS FOR POLYMERIZING CYCLOOLEFINS[2000/37]
French:CATALYSEUR ET PROCEDES DE POLYMERISATION DE CYCLO-OLEFINES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2000National basic fee paid 
29.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
29.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2004Fee for grant paid
31.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
CY05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
[2008/23]
Former [2008/18]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
IT12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
PT12.06.2005
CY05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
Former [2007/23]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
CY05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
Former [2006/49]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
IE05.10.2005
Former [2006/22]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
NL12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
CH12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
LI12.01.2005
DK12.04.2005
SE12.04.2005
ES23.04.2005
Former [2005/51]AT12.01.2005
BE12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/48]FI12.01.2005
SE12.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI12.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9856839  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [PX] 1-101 * example - * * claim - *;
 [X]WO9720871  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1-101 * example - * * claim - *;
 [XD]WO9637529  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [XD] 1-101 * example - * * claim - *;
 [AD]WO9733198  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [AD] 1-101 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9514048  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-101 * claim - *;
 [PA]DE19716312  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PA] 1-101 * example - * * claim - *