Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994744 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994744



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
25.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3
25.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 25
25.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 12
25.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
09.08.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
18.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 42
18.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
25.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 40
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
20.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.02.2000 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
16.03.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
05.07.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.02.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1