blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994744 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994744



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
11.02.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.07.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
29.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.09.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
20.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 40
01.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
25.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
18.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 42
09.08.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
25.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
25.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 12
25.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 25
25.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3