blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0994744


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.07.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.08.2004  [2004/35]
02.06.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
12.03.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
26.09.2003 First examination report
25.09.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.04.2003 Renewal fee
27.04.2002 Renewal fee
25.04.2001 Renewal fee
26.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
18.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication