Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0994744
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7093601Global Dossier 22.08.2006B2
US2003191513 09.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US76674601 22.01.2001
US23206202 30.08.2002
US40581403 02.04.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4092079BGlobal Dossier 28.05.2008B2
JP2002514480 21.05.2002A
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US9909416 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0994744Global Dossier 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US9909416 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU756217B 09.01.2003B2
AU5948599 29.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US9909416 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2296057 19.02.2008C
CA2296057 18.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US9909416 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6522931 18.02.2003B2
US2002000234 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US76674601 22.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7089064 08.08.2006B2
US2003023238 30.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
US76674601 22.01.2001
US23206202 30.08.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9958194Global Dossier 18.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6216703 17.04.2001B1
Priority number Date
US13070898 06.08.1998
US8471498 08.05.1998