Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994744

EP0994744 - THERAPEUTIC PROSTATIC THERMOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TherMatrx, Inc.
2211-B Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, Illinois 60015 / US
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MANKER, Charles, F.
35 North Green Bay Road
Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US
02 / PERLMUTTER, Aaron, P.
525 East 89th Street 5A
New York, NY 10128 / US
03 / SCHAEFERMEYER, Therone, N.
851 East Eaglewood Drive
North Salt Lake, UT 85054 / US
04 / SELLS, Dixie, T.
2934 East Cobblemoor Lane
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
05 / TURNER, Paul, F.
762 Lacey Way
North Salt Lake, UT 84054 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Beck, Jürgen
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Beck, Jürgen, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99950327.930.04.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999US09416
Priority number, dateUS19980084714P08.05.1998         Original published format: US 84714 P
US1998013070806.08.1998         Original published format: US 130708
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9958194
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994744
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG DER PROSTATA[2000/17]
English:THERAPEUTIC PROSTATIC THERMOTHERAPY[2000/17]
French:TRAITEMENT DE LA PROSTATE PAR THERMOTHERAPIE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2000National basic fee paid 
20.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
29.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
16.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5354325  (CHIVE MAURICE [FR], et al) [X] 18,19,23,24 * column 4, line 1 - line 49 * * column 12, line 29 - line 35; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5542916  (HIRSCH CHAYA [US], et al) [X] 18,19,22,25,26 * column 4, line 39 - line 67 * * column 6, line 32 - line 41; figure 4; table 1 *;
 [X]US5620480  (RUDIE ERIC N [US]) [X] 18,19 * column 4, line 5 - line 49 * * column 10, line 17 - column 11, line 67; figures 2,9 *;
 [A]WO9701374  (UROLOGIX INC [US]) [A] 18,19,22-26 * page 14, line 16 - page 16, line 14; figure 5A *;
 [A]US5197940  (SIEVERT CHESTER E [US], et al) [A] 18,20-22 * column 9, line 29 - line 62 *;
 [A]US5571153  (WALLSTEN HANS IVAR [CH]) [A] 18,20,21 * column 14, line 27 - line 49; figure 11; claim 6 *
 [A]  - DIEDERICH C J ET AL, "COMBINATION OF IMPLANTABLE AND TRANSURETHRAL ULTRASOUND APPLICATORSFOR PROSTATE THERMAL THERAPY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, ONTARIO, CANADA, OCT. 5 - 8, 1997, SCHNEIDER;S C; LEVY; M; MCAVOY; B R (EDS ), (19971005), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-4154-6, pages 1337 - 1340, XP000800021 [A] 18,20,21