blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1127181

EP1127181 - THREAD GRIPPER FOR A RAPIER OF A RAPIER LOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 28.07.2010  [2010/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Picanol N.V.
Ter Waarde 50
8900 Ieper / BE
[2003/34]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
Picanol N.V.
Polenlaan 3-7
8900 Ieper / BE
Inventor(s)01 / VERCLYTE, Eddy
Potakker 12
B-8900 Ieper / BE
 [2001/35]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99950613.205.10.1999
[2001/35]
WO1999EP07353
Priority number, dateBE1998000075521.10.1998         Original published format: BE 9800755
BE1999000007003.02.1999         Original published format: BE 9900070
[2001/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0023642
Date:27.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1127181
Date:29.08.2001
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1127181
Date:04.01.2006
Language:DE
[2006/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1127181
Date:28.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:D03D47/23
[2001/35]
CPC:
D03D47/233 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/01]
Former [2001/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:FADENKLEMME FÜR EINEN GREIFER EINER GREIFERWEBMASCHINE[2001/35]
English:THREAD GRIPPER FOR A RAPIER OF A RAPIER LOOM[2001/35]
French:PINCE A FIL POUR UNE LANCE D'UNE MACHINE A TISSER A LANCES[2001/35]
Entry into regional phase06.04.2001National basic fee paid 
06.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
07.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2005Fee for grant paid
13.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.10.2006  11.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft mbH
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
D-88129 Lindau/Bodensee / DE
Opponent's representative
Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al, et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/46]
Opponent(s)01  04.10.2006  11.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft mbH
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
D-88129 Lindau/Bodensee / DE
Opponent's representative
Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
08.11.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.02.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.03.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.06.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
GB04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
AT05.10.2006
LU05.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI04.01.2006
GB04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
AT05.10.2006
LU05.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/21]FI04.01.2006
GB04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
AT05.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/18]FI04.01.2006
GB04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
AT05.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/23]FI04.01.2006
GB04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2007/02]FI04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2006/49]FI04.01.2006
IE04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
SE04.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2006/45]FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
SE04.04.2006
ES15.04.2006
Former [2006/36]FI04.01.2006
ES15.04.2006
Former [2006/34]ES15.04.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0207533  (PICANOL NV [BE]) [A] 1,8,10 * page 5, line 13 - page 9, line 22; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0509255  (SOMET SOC MEC TESSILE [IT]);
 [AP]WO9918274  (PICANOL NV [BE], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.