blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1126952

EP1126952 - BELT FOR POLISHING SEMICONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Praxair S.T. Technology, Inc.
441 Sackett Point Road
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
[2004/02]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
Peripheral Products Inc
47 Northwestern Drive
Salem, New Hampshire 03279 / US
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
SCAPA GROUP PLC
Oakfield House 52 Preston New Road
Blackburn Lancashire BB2 6AH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / LOMBARDO, Brian
11 Buckridge Drive
Amherst, NH 03031 / US
 [2001/35]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Centurion House
129 Deansgate
Manchester M3 3WR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Phillips, Patricia Marie
Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street
Manchester M2 7BD / GB
Application number, filing date99950961.522.10.1999
[2001/35]
WO1999GB03507
Priority number, dateUS19980105606P26.10.1998         Original published format: US 105606 P
[2001/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0024550
Date:04.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1126952
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1126952
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:B24D11/00, B24B37/04, B24B21/04, // H01L21:304
[2001/35]
CPC:
B24B37/11 (EP,US); H01L21/302 (KR); B24B21/04 (EP,US);
B24D11/005 (EP,US); B24D11/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2004/03]
Former [2001/35]DE,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT 
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERPOLIERBAND[2001/35]
English:BELT FOR POLISHING SEMICONDUCTORS[2001/35]
French:COURROIE DE POLISSAGE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2001/35]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2001National basic fee paid 
24.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
06.06.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2003Fee for grant paid
22.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US1994283  (MARTIN HARRY C) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [XA]WO9312911  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 3 - line 28 * [A] 8,9,11;
 [A]WO9835785  (LAM RES CORP [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.