Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1125320

EP1125320 - LOW TEMPERATURE FORMATION OF BACKSIDE OHMIC CONTACTS FOR VERTICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.10.2009
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cree, Inc.
4600 Silicon Drive
Durham, NC 27703 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]For all designated states
CREE, INC.
4600 Silicon Drive
Durham, NC 27703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SLATER, David, B., Jr.
6304 Jarratt Cove
Raleigh, NC 27613 / US
 [2001/34]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Brophy, David Timothy , et al
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2010/35]Kelly, Madeleine , et al
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2001/34]Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date99951484.716.09.1999
[2001/34]
WO1999US21475
Priority number, dateUS19980100546P16.09.1998         Original published format: US 100546 P
[2001/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0016382
Date:23.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1125320
Date:22.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000
[2001/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/04
[2001/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON OHMSCHEN RÜCKSEITENKONTAKTEN ZU VERTIKAL ANGEORDNETEN HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNGEN BEI NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUR[2001/34]
English:LOW TEMPERATURE FORMATION OF BACKSIDE OHMIC CONTACTS FOR VERTICAL DEVICES[2001/34]
French:FORMATION A BASSE TEMPERATURE DE CONTACTS OHMIQUES REALISES SUR L'ENVERS DESTINES A DES DISPOSITIFS VERTICAUX[2001/34]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2001National basic fee paid 
30.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
25.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination29.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1611/16
26.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 18
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 19
10.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 20
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9837584  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA ;SHENAI KRISHNA (US)) [X] 15,16,18-20 * page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 14; figures 3,10 * [Y] 8,11,13,14,21,22,24-27;
 [XDA]US5409859  (GLASS ROBERT C ET AL) [XD] 1,3-7 * the whole document * [A] 8,11-27;
 [YA]JPH0982663  ;
 [XY]  - SPIESS L ET AL, "Aluminium implantation of p-SiC for ohmic contacts", FIRST EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SILICON CARBIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS (ECSCRM 96), HERAKLION, GREECE, 6-9 OCT. 1996, Diamond and Related Materials, Aug. 1997, Elsevier, Switzerland, vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1414 - 1419, XP002129219 [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 1415, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 3; figures 2,3 * [Y] 8,11,13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(97)00047-2
 [XA]  - DEV ALOK ET AL, "LOW CONTACT RESISTIVITY OHMIC CONTACTS TO 6H-SILICON CARBIDE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1993), ISBN 0-7803-1451-4, pages 691 - 694, XP000481708 [X] 15-19,21 * page 692, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * [A] 3-6,8,11-13,22-25,27
 [XA]  - CHEN J S ET AL, "CONTACT RESISTIVITY OF RE,PT AND TA FILMS ON N-TYPE BETA-SIC: PRELIMINARY RESULTS", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, (19950101), vol. B29, no. 1/03, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 185 - 189, XP000513498 [X] 1,3-7 * page 186, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 187, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2; figure 3 * [A] 8,11-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5107(94)04049-A
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09082663 A 19970328 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 21,22,24-27 * abstract * [A] 1,2,6-10,13,14
 [A]  - PORTER L M ET AL, "A CRITICAL REVIEW OF OHMIC AND RECTIFYING CONTACTS FOR SILICON CARBIDE", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, (19951101), vol. B34, no. 2/03, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 83 - 105, XP000627607 [A] 1-27 * page 93, column L, paragraph 4 - page 96, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 97, column R, paragraph 3 - page 100, column R, paragraph 1; tables 5,6,8,9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0921-5107(95)01276-1