EP1035890 - IMPLANTABLE STIMULATION LEAD FOR USE WITH AN ICD DEVICE HAVING AUTOCAPTURE PACING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROLL, Mark, W. 493 Sinaloa Road Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951780.8 | 06.10.1999 | [2000/38] | WO1999US23139 | Priority number, date | US19980168207 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 168207 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020071 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035890 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/0563 (EP,US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US);
A61N1/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2004/22] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE STIMULATIONSLEITUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM ICD MIT AUTOCAPTURE FUNKTION | [2000/38] | English: | IMPLANTABLE STIMULATION LEAD FOR USE WITH AN ICD DEVICE HAVING AUTOCAPTURE PACING FEATURES | [2000/38] | French: | ELECTRODE DE STIMULATION IMPLANTABLE S'UTILISANT AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE DEFRIBRILLATEUR IMPLANTABLE (ICD) ET COMPORTANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES D'ENTRAINEMENT A CAPTURE AUTOMATIQUE | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP09005222.6 / EP2092953 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5243980 (MEHRA RAHUL [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 57 - line 59 * * column 7, line 21 - line 36 * * column 8, line 28 - line 32; figure - *; | [X]US4662377 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 34; figure - * | International search | [X]US5456706 (PLESS BENJAMIN D [US], et al) | by applicant | US5336253 | US5342414 | US4355646 | US5545183 |