Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038251

EP1038251 - DOCUMENTS FOR COMMERCE IN TRADING PARTNER NETWORKS AND INTERFACE DEFINITIONS BASED ON THE DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2014Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.02.2014  [2014/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Red Hat, Inc.
1801 Varsity Drive
Raleigh NC 27606 / US
[2012/43]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
Open Invention Network, LLC
P.O. Box 357
Pound Ridge NY 10576 / US
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
JGR Acquisition, Inc.
1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347
Wilmington, DE 19899 / US
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
Commerce One Operations, Inc.
7th Floor, 2440 West El Camino Real
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Commerce One, Inc.
7th Floor, 2440 West El Camino Real
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MELTZER, Bart, Alan
530 Santa Marguarita
Aptos, CA 95003 / US
02 / ALLEN, Terry
234 Sebastopol Road
Sebastopol, CA 95473 / US
03 / FUCHS, Matthew, Daniel
16229 Jacaranda Way
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
04 / GLUSHKO, Robert, John
159 Mendosa Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
05 / MALONEY, Murray
671 Cowan Circle
Pickering, Ontario L1W 3K6 / CA
06 / DAVIDSON, Andrew, Everett
1222 Hopkins Gulch
Boulder Creek, CA 95006 / US
07 / PERSSON, Kenneth
500 Village Circle
Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US
08 / SCHWARZHOFF, Kelly, Lane
Apartment 204, 535 Arastradero Road
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Horner, David Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Horner, David Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2005/12]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2005/04](deleted)
...
Former [2004/41]Fennell, Gareth Charles
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/39]Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99951857.408.10.1999
[2000/39]
WO1999US23426
Priority number, dateUS1998017385816.10.1998         Original published format: US 173858
US1998017384716.10.1998         Original published format: US 173847
US1998017385416.10.1998         Original published format: US 173854
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0023925
Date:27.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1038251
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:DOKUMENTE FÜR DEN HANDEL IN PARTNERNETZWERKEN UND SCHNITTSTELLEN-DEFINITIONEN AUF BASIS DER DOKUMENTE[2000/39]
English:DOCUMENTS FOR COMMERCE IN TRADING PARTNER NETWORKS AND INTERFACE DEFINITIONS BASED ON THE DOCUMENTS[2000/39]
French:DOCUMENTS POUR LE COMMERCE UTILISES DANS DES RESEAUX DE PARTENAIRES COMMERCIAUX ET DEFINITIONS D'INTERFACES FONDEES SUR CES DOCUMENTS[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2000National basic fee paid 
12.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
27.03.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2013
30.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/07]
10.10.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/07]
16.10.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2004
31.10.201315   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9834179  (TIME BASE PTY LIMITED [AU], et al) [A] 1,17,39,61,73,98,212,236 * abstract * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 20 *;
 [X]  - DUDECK J, "Aspects of implementing and harmonizing healthcare communication standards", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL INFORMATICS,IR,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SHANNON, (19980201), vol. 48, no. 1-3, ISSN 1386-5056, pages 163 - 171, XP004115318 [X] 1-258 * abstract * * page 169, column 1, line 33 - page 170, column 2, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-5056(97)00122-6
 [X]  - KRISTENSEN A, "Template resolution in XML/HTML", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19980401), vol. 30, no. 1-7, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 239 - 249, XP004121423 [X] 1-258 * abstract * * page 239, column 1, line 1 - page 248, column 2, line 23 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00023-3
 [A]  - LIECHTI O ET AL, "Structured graph format: XML metadata for describing Web site structure", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19980401), vol. 30, no. 1-7, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 11 - 21, XP004121444 [A] 1,17,39,61,73,98,212,236 * abstract * * page 11, column 1, line 1 - page 209, column 1, line 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00039-7